Global Patent Index - EP 1319838 A1

EP 1319838 A1 2003-06-18 - Scroll compressor

Title (en)

Scroll compressor

Title (de)

Spiralverdichter

Title (fr)

Compresseur à spirales

Publication

EP 1319838 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 03006364 A

Priority

  • EP 98117556 A
  • JP 26193397 A

Abstract (en)

A highly reliable scroll compressor with an improved oil injection mechanism having a particular composition in a particular position in a scroll compression element is disclosed. The oil injection mechanism for injecting and supplying a lubricant is provided in the vicinity of an intake position where a refrigerant gas is introduced from outside an hermetic housing into the scroll compression element via an intake pipe. The oil injection mechanism is fixed to a support frame being composed of an oil nozzle for injecting the lubricant through an oil feed passage and a valve that opens/closes an oil feed passage inlet of the oil nozzle by utilizing the elasticity of a spring. The oil injection mechanism may be fixed at other location than the support frame; it may be secured, for example, to an stationary scroll. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02; F04C 29/02; F04C 29/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/02 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/0215 (2013.01); F04C 29/0014 (2013.01); F04C 29/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4494914 A 19850122 - SHIIBAYASHI MASAO [JP]
  • [A] EP 0648932 A1 19950419 - TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]
  • [A] DE 9210747 U1 19921112
  • [A] US 5110268 A 19920505 - SAKURAI KAZUO [JP], et al
  • [A] US 5013225 A 19910507 - RICHARDSON JR HUBERT [US]
  • [A] US 5660539 A 19970826 - MATSUNAGA MUTSUNORI [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 297 (M - 1617) 7 June 1994 (1994-06-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 297 (M - 1617) 7 June 1994 (1994-06-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 069 (M - 1083) 19 February 1991 (1991-02-19)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 025 (M - 556) 23 January 1987 (1987-01-23)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 159 (M - 228) 13 July 1983 (1983-07-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 270 (M - 344) 11 December 1984 (1984-12-11)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 013 (M - 1069) 11 January 1991 (1991-01-11)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 427 (M - 1174) 30 October 1991 (1991-10-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 545 (M - 1337) 16 November 1992 (1992-11-16)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

DOCDB simple family

EP 1319838 A1 20030618; EP 1319838 B1 20050727; DE 69831023 D1 20050901; DE 69831023 T2 20060601; DE 69831024 D1 20050901; DE 69831024 T2 20060601; EP 1319839 A1 20030618; EP 1319839 B1 20050727; ES 2246024 T3 20060201; ES 2246025 T3 20060201; JP 3448469 B2 20030922; JP H11101187 A 19990413