EP 1319840 A1 20030618 - Scroll compressor
Title (en)
Scroll compressor
Title (de)
Spiralverdichter
Title (fr)
Compresseur à spirales
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 98117556 A 19980916
- JP 25212597 A 19970917
Abstract (en)
A highly reliable scroll compressor with an unproved bearing lubrication comprises a refrigerant gas intake side, a rear surface of a swivel scroll and a main support frame, which are placed in communication the pressure among them being set low. The refrigerant gas is compressed under a gas-sealed condition while holding the swivel scroll away from a stationary scroll, and a lubricant is introduced from a lubricating portion and fed to sliding parts including a bearing via an oil feed passage provided in an rotating shaft, the lubricant being circulated for repeated use. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F04C 29/02 (2006.01); F04C 18/02 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
F04C 18/0215 (2013.01); F04C 23/008 (2013.01); F04C 29/023 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] DE 9210747 U1 19921112
- [Y] US 5110268 A 19920505 - SAKURAI KAZUO [JP], et al
- [X] US 5013225 A 19910507 - RICHARDSON JR HUBERT [US]
- [A] US 5660539 A 19970826 - MATSUNAGA MUTSUNORI [JP], et al
- [A] US 4494914 A 19850122 - SHIIBAYASHI MASAO [JP]
- [A] EP 0648932 A1 19950419 - TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 013 (M - 1069) 11 January 1991 (1991-01-11)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 427 (M - 1174) 30 October 1991 (1991-10-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 545 (M - 1337) 16 November 1992 (1992-11-16)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 025 (M - 556) 23 January 1987 (1987-01-23)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 159 (M - 228) 13 July 1983 (1983-07-13)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 270 (M - 344) 11 December 1984 (1984-12-11)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 297 (M - 1617) 7 June 1994 (1994-06-07)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 297 (M - 1617) 7 June 1994 (1994-06-07)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 069 (M - 1083) 19 February 1991 (1991-02-19)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1319840 A1 20030618; EP 1319840 B1 20050720; CN 1837617 A 20060927; DE 69830934 D1 20050825; DE 69830934 T2 20060524; ES 2246026 T3 20060201; JP 3448466 B2 20030922; JP H1193869 A 19990406
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 03006366 A 19980916; CN 200610059884 A 19980916; DE 69830934 T 19980916; ES 03006366 T 19980916; JP 25212597 A 19970917