Global Patent Index - EP 1319843 A2

EP 1319843 A2 2003-06-18 - Coolant pump

Title (en)

Coolant pump

Title (de)

Kühlmittelpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à liquide de refroidissement

Publication

EP 1319843 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024859 A

Priority

DE 10160876 A

Abstract (en)

The pump includes a housing (2) with a cavity (3) for the bearing (4) of the vane wheel shaft (6), and a venting channel (12) leading out from the collecting chamber (11). The venting channel comes out into the collecting chamber at a point which ensures that if the speed changes suddenly, there is no static coolant left in the engine.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kühlmittelpumpe für eine flüssigkeitsgekühlte Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere auf Fahrzeugen, umfasst eine gehäusegelagerte Antriebswelle für ein Flügelrad zur Kühlmittelförderung, wobei eine durch minimalen Kühlmitteldurchtritt zur Schmierung und Kühlung vorgesehene Gleitringdichtung das Wellenlager unter Zwischenschaltung einer Auffangkammer vor dem Kühlmittel schützt. Die Auffangkammer steht über einen Ablaufkanal mit einer Sammelkammer im/am Gehäuse der Kühlmittelpumpe in Verbindung, wobei die Sammelkammer über einen Entlüftungskanal mit der freien Umgebung in Verbindung steht. Zur Vermeidung eines Kühlmittelauswurfs über den Entlüftungskanal bei einer Geschwindigkeitsänderung der bewegten Brennkraftmaschine wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, dass der Entlüftungskanal in die Sammelkammer in einem solchen Kammerabschnitt mündet, der z.B. bei einer verzögerten Bewegung der als Teil eines bewegbaren Antriebsaggregates dienenden Brennkraftmaschine frei von gesammeltem Kühlmittel ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 29/12; F16J 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/10 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/426 (2013.01); F04D 29/106 (2013.01); F05B 2260/603 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319843 A2 20030618; EP 1319843 A3 20040128; EP 1319843 B1 20060208; DE 10160876 A1 20030626; DE 50205783 D1 20060420

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50205783 P 20060420

2006-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060208

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060208

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/42 A

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/12 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16J 15/00 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI