Global Patent Index - EP 1319844 A1

EP 1319844 A1 2003-06-18 - Shroude for retaining blade shafts of adjustable stator vanes in a high pressure compressor of a gas turbine

Title (en)

Shroude for retaining blade shafts of adjustable stator vanes in a high pressure compressor of a gas turbine

Title (de)

Lagerring zur Lagerung von Schaufelfüssen von verstellbaren Statorschaufeln im Hochdruckverdichter einer Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Bague extérieure pour recevoir des pieds d'aubes de volets redresseurs dans un compresseur haute pression d'une turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 1319844 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02023209 A

Priority

DE 10161292 A

Abstract (en)

The device has forward and rear annular bases (3,4) with axially open annular spaces (5) to form a U-shaped cross-section and a number of axial mounting bores (6). An annular cover body (7) arranged in the opening region of the annular space (5) has mounting openings (8) and a tubular supporting element (9) is arranged between the mounting openings and the associated mounting bores in the bases.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Lagerring zur Lagerung von Schaufelfüßen 1 von verstellbaren Statorschaufeln 2 im Hochdruckverdichter einer Gasturbine, mit einem vorderen 3 und einem hinteren 4 ringförmigen Grundkörper, der jeweils zur Ausbildung eines im Wesentlichen U-förmigen Querschnitts einen axial offenen Ringraum 5 aufweist, sowie eine Vielzahl von axialen Montagebohrungen 6, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass im Öffnungsbereich des Ringraums 5 ein ringförmiger Abdeckkörper 7 angeordnet ist, welcher mit Montageausnehmungen 8 versehen ist, und dass im Zwischenbereich zwischen der Montageausnehmung 8 des Abdeckkörpers 7 und der zugeordneten Montagebohrung 5 des Grundkörpers 3, 4 ein rohrartiges Stützelement 9 angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/54; F01D 9/04; F04D 29/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/16 (2006.01); F01D 25/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/16 (2013.01); F01D 17/162 (2013.01); F01D 25/243 (2013.01); F04D 29/542 (2013.01); F01D 11/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319844 A1 20030618; EP 1319844 B1 20091202; DE 10161292 A1 20030626; DE 50214035 D1 20100114; US 2003113204 A1 20030619; US 6790000 B2 20040914

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50214035

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131016

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131016

2013-05-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, 15827 BLANKENFELDE, DE

- Document: DE 50214035

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214035

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50214035

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100903

2010-01-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50214035 P 20100114

2009-12-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-12-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-09-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WOLF, NORBERT

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI