Global Patent Index - EP 1319889 A1

EP 1319889 A1 2003-06-18 - Luminaire with inductive energy transmission

Title (en)

Luminaire with inductive energy transmission

Title (de)

Leuchte mit induktiver Energieübertragung

Title (fr)

Luminaire avec transfert d'énergie par induction

Publication

EP 1319889 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02027779 A

Priority

DE 10161545 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a supply part (1) and a light source part (2) as separate connectable components, whereby the light source part has one or more light sources (10) supplied with electrical energy by the supply part. The supply and light source parts both have an energy converter (4,14) for energy transfer that can be coupled together to transfer energy between the parts inductively. <??>AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a light system with several inventive devices, a supply part for an inventive device a light source part for an inventive device.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchte, welche ein Versorgungsteil (1) und ein Leuchtmittelteil (2) umfaßt, die als getrennte, verbindbare Bauteile ausgebildet sind, wobei das Leuchtmittelteil (2) eine oder mehrere Lichtquellen (10) umfaßt, die von dem Versorgungsteil (1) mit elektrischer Energie versorgt werden, wobei das Versorgungsteil (1) und das Leuchtmittelteil (2) jeweils eine Energieumwandlungseinrichtung (4,14,16) aufweisen und die beiden Energieumwandlungseinrichtungen (4,14,16) im verbundenen Zustand des Versorgungsteils (1) und des Leuchtmittelteils (2) miteinander gekoppelt und so eingerichtet sind, daß die Energieübertragung zwischen dem Versorgungsteil (1) und dem Leuchtmittelteil (2) mittels Induktion erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 23/02; F21V 25/12; H01F 38/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 4/10 (2016.01); F21V 23/02 (2006.01); F21V 25/12 (2006.01); F21V 31/04 (2006.01); H01F 38/14 (2006.01); F21Y 115/10 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0803 (2013.01); F21S 4/10 (2016.01); F21V 23/02 (2013.01); F21V 25/12 (2013.01); F21V 31/04 (2013.01); H01F 38/14 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319889 A1 20030618; EP 1319889 B1 20060719; AT 333625 T 20060815; DE 10161545 A1 20030703; DE 50207555 D1 20060831

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 333625 T

- Effective date: 20121019

2012-10-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121004 AND 20121010

2012-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Free text: SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH#GEORG-SIMON-OHM-STR. 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH#GEORG-SIMON-OHM-STR. 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE)

2012-04-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH

- Free text: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH#OHMSTRASSE 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH#GEORG-SIMON-OHM-STR. 50#83301 TRAUNREUT (DE)

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, 83301 TRAUNREUT, DE

- Document: DE 50207555

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50207555

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50207555

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50207555

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061211

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-06-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-02-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061219

2006-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061030

2006-10-19 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-10-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207555 P 20060831

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-19 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO