Global Patent Index - EP 1319894 A2

EP 1319894 A2 2003-06-18 - Method of incinerating waste and device for treating the exhaust gas from an incineration method

Title (en)

Method of incinerating waste and device for treating the exhaust gas from an incineration method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbrennen von Abfällen und Vorrichtung zum Behandeln der Abgase einer Abfallverbrennung

Title (fr)

Procédé d'incinération de déchets et dispositif pour traiter le gaz d'échappement provenant de ce procédé

Publication

EP 1319894 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026518 A

Priority

DE 10160756 A

Abstract (en)

Incineration of waste material comprises burning material to produce flue gas containing less than 4% oxygen, separating dust from gas, passing gas through first dwell chamber a temperature-dependent residence time, cooling gas to 900-1050 degrees C, spraying nitrogen oxide reducer into gas and allowing it to act in second dwell chamber for at least 0.3 second, and passing gas through tubing at rate of at least 3 kg/h.cm<2>. <??>Incineration of waste material comprises burning the material to produce a flue gas containing less than 4% oxygen; separating dust from the gas; passing the gas through a first dwell chamber in which the residence time (in seconds) is 2.00 at a gas temperature of 1000 degrees C, 0.60 at 1100 degrees C, 0.10 at 1200 degrees C, 0.02 at 1300 degrees C and 0.01 at 1400 degrees C, with interpolated residence times for intermediate temperatures; cooling the gas to 900-1050 degrees C; spraying a nitrogen oxide reducer into the gas an allowing it to act in a second dwell chamber for at least 0.3 second, and passing the gas through tubing at a rate of at least 3 kg/h.cm<2>. <??>An Independent claim is also included for apparatus for treating flue gas from the combustion of waste material, comprising a first dwell chamber (5), tubing (6) for cooling the gas to 900-1500 degrees C, a spray head (8) for spraying a nitrogen oxide reducer into the gas, a second dwell chamber (9) and tubing (12) for further cooling the gas.

Abstract (de)

Die Abgase einer Verbrennung von Abfällen, insbesondere von Holzabfällen, werden ohne Zuhilfenahme von Filtern, Gaswäschern oder Katalysatoranlagen in einen nach der 17. BlmSchV vorgeschriebenen Zustand gebracht. Der Abfall wird nahezu stöchiometrisch verbrannt, die heißen Verbrennungsabgase läßt man eine vorgegebene Zeitdauer auf hoher Temperatur verweilen, bevor sie auf eine Temperatur zwischen 900°C abgekühlt werden, woraufhin ein Entstickungsmittel eingedüst wird, das man eine vorgegebene Zeitdauer einwirken läßt, bevor die Gase weiter abgekühlt werden. Bevor eine untere Grenztemperatur von 450°C erreicht wird, werden die Abgase entstaubt. Die Endbehandlung erfolgt in einem Rohrzug, der mit einer Massenstromdichte von wenigstens 3 kg/h·cm<2> durchströmt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 15/00; F23G 5/16; F23G 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/16 (2006.01); F23G 7/10 (2006.01); F23J 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 15/003 (2013.01); F23G 5/16 (2013.01); F23G 7/105 (2013.01); F23J 15/006 (2013.01); F23J 2215/10 (2013.01); F23J 2217/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319894 A2 20030618; EP 1319894 A3 20031126; EP 1319894 B1 20070321; DE 10160756 A1 20030618; DE 50209763 D1 20070503

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50209763

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHOPPE, FRITZ, DR.-ING.

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091203

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071227

2007-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50209763 P 20070503

2007-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI