Global Patent Index - EP 1319895 A2

EP 1319895 A2 2003-06-18 - Lean-burn premix burner for gas turbine and its method of operation

Title (en)

Lean-burn premix burner for gas turbine and its method of operation

Title (de)

Magervormischbrenner für eine Gasturbine sowie Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Magervormischbrenners

Title (fr)

Brûleur à prémélange à combustion pauvre pour turbine à gaz et son procédé de fonctionnement

Publication

EP 1319895 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02023428 A

Priority

DE 10160997 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel supply ring (4) includes multiple primary fuel nozzles and additional secondary fuel nozzles. The primary fuel nozzles are evenly distributed along a circumference of the fuel supply ring while the additional nozzles are distributed unevenly along fuel supply ring circumference. <??>An Independent claim is also included for an operation method for lean premix burner of gas turbine.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Magervormischbrenner für eine Gasturbine, mit zumindest einem mit Brennstoff-Primärdüsen 8 versehenen Brennstoff-Versorgungsring 4, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass an dem Brennstoff-Versorgungsring 4 zusätzliche Brennstoff-Sekundärdüsen 9 vorgesehen sind, sowie ein Verfahren zum Betrieb dieses Magervormischbrenners. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/28; F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/286 (2013.01); F23R 3/346 (2013.01); F23C 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319895 A2 20030618; EP 1319895 A3 20040107; EP 1319895 B1 20071107; DE 10160997 A1 20030703; DE 50211162 D1 20071220; US 2003106321 A1 20030612; US 6945053 B2 20050920

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141019

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141019

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50211162

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-05-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, 15827 BLANKENFELDE, DE

- Document: DE 50211162

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211162

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211162

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50211162

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

2008-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211162 P 20071220

2007-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071107

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061229

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI