Global Patent Index - EP 1319897 A2

EP 1319897 A2 2003-06-18 - Method for operating a cooking oven and cooking oven

Title (en)

Method for operating a cooking oven and cooking oven

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Garofens sowie Garofen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'un four de cuisson et four de cuisson

Publication

EP 1319897 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024727 A

Priority

DE 10161184 A

Abstract (en)

The oven control unit has a programme selector (4), a memory (6,8) and heating (10), fan (12) and flap (14) units. Different cooking products have different requirements for forced ventilation by controlling the fan speed or an outlet flap. The requirements are stored as programmes.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Garofens, bei dem die Intensität seiner Belüftung in Abhängigkeit von vorbestimmten Prozeßdaten eines ausgewählten Rezeptes gesteuert wird. Darüber hinaus betrifft die Erfindung einen entsprechenden Garofen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08; F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/2021 (2013.01); F24C 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3804678 A1 19890824 - BUDERUS KUECHENTECHNIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319897 A2 20030618; EP 1319897 A3 20041208; DE 10161184 A1 20030710; EP 2280226 A2 20110202

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160601

2011-07-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION N.V.

2011-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION N.V.

2007-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061214

2005-08-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI SE

2005-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI