Global Patent Index - EP 1319902 A1

EP 1319902 A1 2003-06-18 - A heating device to be mounted at a ceiling

Title (en)

A heating device to be mounted at a ceiling

Title (de)

Heizeinrichtung zur Deckenmontage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage pour montage au plafond

Publication

EP 1319902 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02445162 A

Priority

SE 0104123 A

Abstract (en)

A ceiling heating device to be mounted at the ceiling of a room. The device has an air flow chamber (10) with an outflow opening (10c of the supply of warm air from the device to the room. Adjacent to the outflow opening, there is metal panel (13) which, upon supply of the warm air, will be heated to a temperature which brings its downwardly facing surface to emit heat radiation downwardly to the room. In this way, an effective heat transfer to the air in the living zone of the room is obtained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 5/00; F24F 1/00; F24F 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 1/01 (2011.01); F24F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0059 (2013.01); F24F 1/01 (2013.01); F24F 5/0089 (2013.01); F24F 5/0092 (2013.01); F24F 2221/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319902 A1 20030618; NO 20025889 A 20030610; NO 20025889 D0 20021206; SE 0104123 D0 20011207; SE 0104123 L 20030608; SE 523648 C2 20040504

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI