Global Patent Index - EP 1319903 A1

EP 1319903 A1 2003-06-18 - AIR CONDITIONER WITH HUMIDIFYING FUNCTION

Title (en)

AIR CONDITIONER WITH HUMIDIFYING FUNCTION

Title (de)

KLIMAANLAGE MIT LUFTBEFEUCHTUNG

Title (fr)

CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR A FONCTION D'HUMIDIFICATION

Publication

EP 1319903 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01967717 A

Priority

  • JP 0108091 W
  • JP 2000285177 A

Abstract (en)

This air conditioner having a humidifying function is equipped with an outdoor unit 1 and a humidifying unit 8 placed on the outdoor unit 1. An electrical equipment box of the outdoor unit 1 and electrical equipment of the humidifying unit 8 are connected with wiring 6 via an opening for connection 2a provided in a base plate 2 of the humidifying unit 8. A recessed portion facing the opening for connection 2a of the base plate 2 of the humidifying unit 8 is provided in an upper lid 3 provided on the top side of the electrical equipment box 11 of the outdoor unit 1. Furthermore, holding pawls 4, 5 for holding the wiring 6 are provided in the vicinity of the recessed portion of the upper lid 3 of the outdoor unit 1 as well as a protective cover 7 for protecting the wiring 6. Consequently, an air conditioner having a humidifying function with which workability can be improved and assembly man-hour can be reduced is provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 6/00; F24F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/14 (2006.01); F24F 6/00 (2006.01); F24F 6/08 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/20 (2013.01); F24F 1/06 (2013.01); F24F 6/00 (2013.01); F24F 2013/207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319903 A1 20030618; EP 1319903 A4 20041117; EP 1319903 B1 20080109; AT 383551 T 20080115; CN 1154807 C 20040623; CN 1395668 A 20030205; DE 60132342 D1 20080221; DE 60132342 T2 20090102; ES 2298258 T3 20080516; JP 2002089899 A 20020327; JP 3608491 B2 20050112; KR 100438377 B1 20040702; WO 0225181 A1 20020328

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171005

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170913

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170810

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170912

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080410

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080918

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080918

2009-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-12-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081010

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080409

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080609

2008-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080109

2008-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2298258 T3

2008-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60132342 P 20080221

2008-02-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-01-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041005

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR