Global Patent Index - EP 1319907 A2

EP 1319907 A2 2003-06-18 - Heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 1319907 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258119 A

Priority

JP 2001381196 A

Abstract (en)

A heat exchanger (1) has a first header pipe (3), second header pipe (2), a plurality df tubes (4), and a plurality of fins (5). The first header pipe (3) and a second header pipe (2) are provided in a row arrangement. The first header pipe (3) has a desiccant member (12). The plurality of tubes (4) are provided in communication with the first header pipe (3) and the second header pipe (2). Both end of each tube (4) is inserted into the first header pipe (3) and the second header pipe (2), respectively. Each of the plurality of fins (5) is disposed between said tubes (4). A centre of cross-sectional area of the first header pipe (3) is offset toward one side of the heat exchanger (1) in an air flow direction, and an entire width of the end of each tube (4) is inserted into the first header pipe (3), such that a clearance is created between the end of each tube (4) and the desiccant member (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/04; B60H 1/32; F25B 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F25B 43/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F28F 9/02 (2013.01); F25B 2339/0441 (2013.01); F25B 2400/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319907 A2 20030618; EP 1319907 A3 20030702; CN 1424550 A 20030618; JP 2003185296 A 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060815

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 25B 39/04 A

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 25B 43/00 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60H 1/32 B

2003-07-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 28F 9/02 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI