Global Patent Index - EP 1319916 A2

EP 1319916 A2 2003-06-18 - Subdivided magazine with a releasable additional magazine

Title (en)

Subdivided magazine with a releasable additional magazine

Title (de)

Geteiltes Munitionsmagazin mit entkoppelbarem Zusatzmagazin

Title (fr)

Magasin en plusieurs parties comportant un magasin additionel débrayable

Publication

EP 1319916 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02021930 A

Priority

DE 10160207 A

Abstract (en)

The ammunition magazine system for a tank comprises main magazines (3) on either side of the gun (2). Separate auxiliary magazines (4) are attached to these by releasable fasteners (12) and shells (6) are passed from these to the main magazines to keep them full.

Abstract (de)

Für ein gepanzertes Fahrzeug wird vorgeschlagen, ein Munitionsmagazin auf mindestens ein Haupt (3a)- und ein Zusatzmagazin (4a) aufzuteilen und als zwei voneinander getrennte Einzelbehälter auszuführen. An das Hauptmagazin (3a), aus welchem die Munition der Waffe zugeführt wird, kann ein Zusatzmagazin (4a) angeflanscht werden und Munition kann bei Bedarf aus dem Zusatzmagazin an das Hauptmagazin übergeben werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/63 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/63 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19927656 A1 20001221 - KRAUSS MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & C [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319916 A2 20030618; EP 1319916 A3 20050427; DE 10160207 A1 20030618; DE 10160207 B4 20040715; NO 20024931 A 20030610; NO 20024931 D0 20021014; NO 328174 B1 20091228

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090106

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050816

2006-01-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH

2005-05-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-04-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI