Global Patent Index - EP 1319920 A1

EP 1319920 A1 2003-06-18 - Pyrotechnical separator and separation system equipped with said separator

Title (en)

Pyrotechnical separator and separation system equipped with said separator

Title (de)

Pyrotechnische Trennungsvorrichtung und damit ausgerüstetes Trennsystem

Title (fr)

Separateur pyrotechnique et dispositif de separation equipe d'un tel separateur

Publication

EP 1319920 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02293074 A

Priority

FR 0116196 A

Abstract (en)

The pyrotechnic launcher cowling separator charge has the edges (51,52) of the cowling panels (1,2) spaced by a pyrotechnic cord (7-9) and defining lines of separation weakness (14) parallel to the cord. An igniter is provided for firing the charge to split the panels along the liens of weakness. The lines of weakness form a fracture zone (S) tangential to the cord and angled to allow mutual disengagement of the panels.

Abstract (fr)

Il comprend des premier (51) et deuxième (52) flancs d'assemblage de pièces (1; 2a, 2b), devant se séparer selon une direction prédéterminée. Les flancs enserrent entre eux un cordon pyrotechnique (7, 8, 9) écrasé, des première (141) et deuxième (142) zones d'affaiblissement courant sur lesdits premier (51) et deuxième (52) flancs respectivement, parallèlement et au voisinage du cordon (7, 8, 9), et des moyens (11) pour activer sélectivement ledit cordon (7, 8, 9) et provoquer ainsi la rupture desdits flancs (51, 52) au long desdites zones d'affaiblissement (141, 142). Suivant l'invention lesdites zones (141, 142) définissent ensemble une surface enveloppe de cassure (S) tangente au cordon (7, 8, 9) et inclinée sur ladite direction, ladite inclinaison étant orientée de manière à autoriser un dégagement mutuel des deux pièces (1; 2a, 2b) selon ladite direction sans interférence mécanique, à l'activation dudit cordon. Application à l'éjection de la coiffe d'un lanceur spatial. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 15/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 15/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 15/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319920 A1 20030618; EP 1319920 B1 20050629; DE 60204836 D1 20050804; DE 60204836 T2 20060112; ES 2243674 T3 20051201; FR 2833694 A1 20030620; FR 2833694 B1 20060203

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060330

2005-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2243674 T3

2005-10-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60204836 P 20050804

2005-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI SE

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO