Global Patent Index - EP 1319978 A1

EP 1319978 A1 2003-06-18 - Photothermographic materials containing solubilized antifoggants

Title (en)

Photothermographic materials containing solubilized antifoggants

Title (de)

Solubilisierte Antischleiermittel enthaltende photothermographische Materialien

Title (fr)

Matériaux photothermographiques contenant des antivoiles solubilisés

Publication

EP 1319978 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02079961 A

Priority

US 1496101 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6514678B1] Aqueous-based photothermographic materials have improved stability to increase in Dmin during aging by including certain water-soluble or water-dispersible antifoggants that have a pKa of 8 or less. These antifoggants are represented by Structure I:wherein R1 is an aliphatic or cyclic group, R2 and R3 are independently hydrogen or bromine as long as at least one of them is bromine, L is an aliphatic divalent linking group, m and n are independently 0 or 1, and SG is a solubilizing group having a pKa of 8 or less.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/49845 (2013.01); G03C 1/04 (2013.01); G03C 1/34 (2013.01); G03C 1/49863 (2013.01); G03C 1/49881 (2013.01); G03C 2200/43 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 6514678 B1 20030204; DE 60202585 D1 20050217; DE 60202585 T2 20051229; EP 1319978 A1 20030618; EP 1319978 B1 20050112; JP 2003186139 A 20030703

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061128

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061128

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60202585 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI