Global Patent Index - EP 1319998 A1

EP 1319998 A1 2003-06-18 - Luminous hands and display device with such hands, especially for a timepiece

Title (en)

Luminous hands and display device with such hands, especially for a timepiece

Title (de)

Leuchtzeiger und diese aufweisendes Anzeigegerät, insbesondere für eine Uhr

Title (fr)

Aiguilles lumineuses et dispositif d'affichage comportant de telles aiguilles, notamment dans une pièce d'horlogerie

Publication

EP 1319998 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01204843 A

Priority

EP 01204843 A

Abstract (en)

The hands consist of a central head (29,35) which rotates about the timepiece axis (15) and the indicating body of the hands (28,34). Light emitted by three diodes (23) located under the dial (10) is directed axially by a cylindrical light guide (18) to the central heads of the hands where reflectors consisting of dihedral cavities (40,41) intensify the lighting to the body of the hands

Abstract (fr)

Il est prévu un type d'aiguille lumineuse comportant une pièce moulée en matériau transparent qui forme une tête circulaire (29, 35) et un corps d'aiguille (28, 34). Afin de diriger vers l'intérieur du corps une portion d'un faisceau lumineux parallèle à l'axe (15) de l'aiguille, la tête comporte une pluralité de réflecteurs (40, 41) répartis autour de l'axe et formés par des creux en forme de dièdre. Ceci améliore l'intensité et l'uniformité de la lumière dans le corps d'aiguille. Des surfaces inclinées de diffusion, recouvertes d'une peinture de couleur claire, sont ménagées sur la face inférieure de l'aiguille. Dans un dispositif d'affichage à plusieurs aiguilles coaxiales (11, 12) tel que celui d'une montre, les réflecteurs des têtes superposées (29, 35) des aiguilles sont situés à des distances respectives de l'axe qui sont différentes d'une aiguille à l'autre, de sorte qu'ils ne se recouvrent jamais complètement. La source de lumière comporte de préférence trois diodes électroluminescentes (23) situées au-dessous du cadran (10). Un guide de lumière cylindrique (18) est placé entre la source et les têtes d'aiguilles, dans l'orifice central du cadran. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1319998 A1 20030618; EP 1319998 B1 20090715; DE 60139263 D1 20090827

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-12-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: THE SWATCH GROUP RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LTD , CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ASULAB S.A., CH

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121213

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121213

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100416

2009-08-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60139263 P 20090827

2009-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2009-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-07-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2008-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071128

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI