Global Patent Index - EP 1320077 A2

EP 1320077 A2 2003-06-18 - Security Housing

Title (en)

Security Housing

Title (de)

Sicherheitsgehäuse

Title (fr)

Boîtier sécurisé

Publication

EP 1320077 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02026748 A

Priority

DE 10164526 A

Abstract (en)

Security housing (1, 2) for a franking machine, etc. has a support frame for the printing mechanism an print module in an unsecure area. The support frame is supported on a number of edges of the chassis shell that encloses the secure area. The chassis shell of the secure area is designed to prevent the insertion of tools into it.

Abstract (de)

Sicherheitschassis für einen Sicherheitsbereich im Inneren eines Sicherheitsgeehäuses (1, 2), mit einem Stützrahmen (6) für die Druckmechanik im Nichtsicherheitsbereich, wobei ein Druckmodul (7) im Stützrahmen (6) beweglich angeordnet und mechanisch vor einem unberechtigten Zugriff geschützt ist, gekennzeichnet dadurch, dass sich der Stützrahmen (6) auf mindestens einer Funktionskante (541, 541', 541") von mindestens einer Chassisschale (5, 5', 5") abstützt, wobei mindestens zwei voneinander beabstandete Chassisschalen (3, 3', 3", 5, 5', 5") den Sicherheitsbereich umgeben, dass die mindestens eine Funktionskante (54, 54', 54", 541, 541', 541") an ihrem Rand ausgebildete Lüftungsöffnungen (51, 51', 51", 52, 52', 52", 511, 511', 511", 521, 521', 521") aufweist, wobei die geometrische Form des Randes der Funktionskante (54, 54', 54", 541, 541', 541") ein Eindringen von Werkzeugen in den von beiden Chassisschalen (3, 3', 3", 5, 5', 5") eingeschlossenen Sicherheitsbereich unmöglich macht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04; H05K 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1320077 A2 20030618; EP 1320077 A3 20040121; DE 10164526 A1 20030618; US 2003112314 A1 20030619; US 6739717 B2 20040525

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100626

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07B 17/04 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05K 5/02 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO