Global Patent Index - EP 1320147 A1

EP 1320147 A1 2003-06-18 - Tuneable radiation shielding in multiband mobile terminals

Title (en)

Tuneable radiation shielding in multiband mobile terminals

Title (de)

Abstimmbare Strahlungsabschirmung in Multiband-Mobilfunkgeräten

Title (fr)

Blindage de radiation réglable pour des terminaux mobiles multibandes

Publication

EP 1320147 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01129989 A

Priority

EP 01129989 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and a method of shielding a user from electromagnetic radiation (9) emanated from a mobile telecommunication device (20) with operating components (1) having electromagnetic radiation blocking characteristics are presented, the method comprising steps for providing switchable bonds (2, 3) at different positions of an operating component (1) with electromagnetic radiation blocking characteristics, and for selectively switching the bonds (2, 3) depending on a selected operation frequency band to different RF-ground potential terminals available on at least one further operating component (4) of the telecommunication device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 7/02 (2006.01); H01Q 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/245 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 7/02 (2013.01); H01Q 19/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] DE 19860912 A1 20000706 - PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE]
  • [Y] US 6204819 B1 20010320 - HAYES GERARD JAMES [US], et al
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 10 17 November 2000 (2000-11-17)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 06 22 September 2000 (2000-09-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1320147 A1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI