Global Patent Index - EP 1320151 A2

EP 1320151 A2 2003-06-18 - Connection member for cable

Title (en)

Connection member for cable

Title (de)

Anschlusselement für Kabel

Title (fr)

Elément de raccordement pour cable

Publication

EP 1320151 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02024786 A

Priority

DE 20120174 U

Abstract (en)

The connector (1) has cable inner conductor protruding into a holder of the housing inner conductor. The holder wall is radially inwards deformable, at least partly, by one or more clamps to secure the cable inner conductor in the holder. The clamp is located in a tensile element, which is axially displaceable with respect to the clamp axial alignment. The tensile element has at least one edge engaging the clamp, with the edge formed by an intersection line of two conical faces, oppositely mutually inclined.

Abstract (de)

Das Anschlußelement (1) hat ein Gehäuse (2), in dem ein Innenleiter (4) vorgesehen ist, der mit einem Innenleiter des Kabels elektrisch leitend verbunden ist. Um das Kabel einfach und dennoch zuverlässig mit dem Anschlußelement (1) verbinden zu können, ragt der kabelseitige Innenleiter in eine Aufnahme des gehäuseseitigen Innenleiters (4). Die Wandung der Aufnahme ist durch ein Klemmstück (10a, 10b) radial nach innen verformbar und verklemmt den kabelseitigen Innenleiter in der Aufnahme. Die Klemmverbindung zwischen den beiden Innenleitern (4) kann einfach und zuverlässig vorgenommen werden. Ferner wird eine Übertragung bei verschiedenen Frequenzbereichen zuverlässig erreicht. Bei Bedarf kann die Verklemmung des kabelseitigen Innenleiters einfach gelöst werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646; H01R 4/50; H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/59 (2013.01); H01R 9/0521 (2013.01); H01R 24/40 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20120174 U1 20020307; EP 1320151 A2 20030618; EP 1320151 A3 20040114

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-08-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040626

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/646 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/50 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 9/05 B

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI