Global Patent Index - EP 1320264 A2

EP 1320264 A2 2003-06-18 - Method and apparatus for encoding and decoding an orientation interpolator

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for encoding and decoding an orientation interpolator

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kodierung und Dekodierung von Schlüsselwerten eines Orientierungsinterpolators

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour le codage et le décodage d'un interpolateur d'orientation

Publication

EP 1320264 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02258162 A

Priority

  • KR 20020073044 A
  • US 33313001 P
  • US 33454101 P
  • US 34210101 P
  • US 36959702 P

Abstract (en)

A method and an apparatus for encoding and decoding an orientation interpolator indicating the locations of keyframes on a temporal axis and the rotation of an object in each of the keyframes are provided. The apparatus for encoding an orientation interpolator includes an break point extractor which extracts, from a first animation path constituted by an orientation interpolator input thereinto, a minimum number of break points, which can bring about an error of no greater than a predetermined error limit between the first animation path and a second animation to be generated by the extracted break points, a key data encoder which encodes key data input from the break point extractor, and a key value data encoder which encodes key value data input from the break point extractor by generating rotational differential data, by which the object is rotationally transformed by as much as a difference between a rotational transformation value of a current keyframe and a rotational transformation value of a previous keyframe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/24; G06T 9/00; H04N 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/00 (2006.01); G06F 7/38 (2006.01); G06F 17/22 (2006.01); G06T 13/20 (2011.01); H03M 7/30 (2006.01); H03M 7/36 (2006.01); H03M 7/48 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/32 (2006.01); H04N 7/36 (2006.01); H03M 7/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/25 (2014.11); H04N 19/103 (2014.11); H04N 19/12 (2014.11); H04N 19/126 (2014.11); H04N 19/13 (2014.11); H04N 19/136 (2014.11); H04N 19/14 (2014.11); H04N 19/46 (2013.01); H04N 19/70 (2013.01); H03M 7/30 (2013.01); H03M 7/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1320264 A2 20030618; EP 1320264 A3 20050601; EP 1320264 B1 20120321; CN 1187716 C 20050202; CN 1277239 C 20060927; CN 1294540 C 20070110; CN 1428742 A 20030709; CN 1438613 A 20030827; CN 1441387 A 20030910; EP 2278808 A1 20110126; EP 2278808 B1 20121010; ES 2381777 T3 20120531; JP 2003248839 A 20030905; JP 3905834 B2 20070418; KR 100480787 B1 20050407; KR 100499135 B1 20050704; KR 100537500 B1 20060109; KR 100543697 B1 20060120; KR 100552665 B1 20060220; KR 100552666 B1 20060220; KR 100552710 B1 20060220; KR 100561875 B1 20060317; KR 20030043620 A 20030602; KR 20030043621 A 20030602; KR 20030043622 A 20030602; KR 20030043634 A 20030602; KR 20030043655 A 20030602; KR 20030043657 A 20030602; KR 20030043690 A 20030602; KR 20050109413 A 20051121; US 2003128883 A1 20030710; US 7446771 B2 20081104

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151128

2016-12-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161227

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151127

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-08-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151127

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60242441

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141015

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141015

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141015

- Year of fee payment: 13

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141016

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-04-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60242441

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130102

2012-09-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

2012-06-20 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-05-31 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2381777 T3

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60242441

- Effective date: 20120510

2012-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL

2012-03-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080409

2006-02-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2005-06-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/24 A

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06T 9/00 B

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/26 B

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIM, DO-KYOON

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUNG, SEOK-YOON

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JANG, EUEE-SEON

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WOO, SANG-OAK

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, SHIN-JUN

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAN, MAHN-JIN

2003-09-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JANG, GYEONG-JA

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021224

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI