Global Patent Index - EP 1320282 A2

EP 1320282 A2 2003-06-18 - Method for recording of information in a hearing aid and such a hearing aid

Title (en)

Method for recording of information in a hearing aid and such a hearing aid

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufzeichnen von Informationen in einem Hörgerät sowie ein Hörgerät

Title (fr)

Procédé d'enregistrement d'information dans une prothèse auditive et une telle prothèse auditive

Publication

EP 1320282 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 03006634 A

Priority

EP 03006634 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves freely setting or programming the time at which the recording is made and/or a recording frequency as well as the information to be recorded, such as the data and/or parameters and/or the settings of the hearing aid. The time of recording can be triggered or altered manually or event-driven <??>AN Independent claim is also included for the following: a hearing aid and a binaural hearing aid.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Aufzeichnen von Informationen in einem Hörgerät und/oder in einer mit diesem zumindest zeitweise wirkverbundenen Aufnahmeeinheit. Das erfindungsgemässe Verfahren besteht darin, dass ein Zeitpunkt der Aufzeichnung und/oder eine Aufzeichnungsfrequenz als auch die aufzuzeichnenden Informationen, wie Daten und/oder Parameter und/oder Einstellungen des Hörgerätes, frei eingestellt bzw. programmiert werden. Des Weiteren ist ein Hörgerät angegeben, dass sich zur Durchführung des Verfahrens eignet. Durch die Erfindung kann eine Vielzahl der bei einem Hörgerät einstellbaren Parameter in realen, d.h. tatsächlich vorhandenen akustischen Umgebungen insgesamt oder selektiv überprüft und überwacht werden, um in der Folge, d.h. nach der Analyse beispielsweise durch den Akustiker, das Hörgerät optimal einstellen bzw. anpassen zu können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/505 (2013.01); H04R 25/502 (2013.01); H04R 25/70 (2013.01); H04R 2225/39 (2013.01); H04R 2225/41 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1320282 A2 20030618; EP 1320282 A3 20040107; DK 1414271 T3 20130930

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-11-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-06-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUEHNEL, VOLKER

2004-06-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ALLEGRO, SILVIA

2004-06-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BORETZKI, MICHAEL

2004-06-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROECK, HANS-UELI

2004-06-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WIDMER, CHRISTOPH

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK

2003-09-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 25/00 A

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK