Global Patent Index - EP 1320361 A1

EP 1320361 A1 2003-06-25 - METHOD FOR REDUCING EXACERBATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH COPD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REDUCING EXACERBATIONS ASSOCIATED WITH COPD

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON VERSCHLIMMERUNGEN IN VERBINDUNG MIT COPD

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REDUIRE LES EXACERBATIONS ASSOCIEES A LA BPCO

Publication

EP 1320361 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01957262 A

Priority

  • US 0123542 W
  • US 22127500 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0209689A1] This invention relates to a method for reducing the incidences and/or the severity of exacerbations of COPD by administering a phosphodiesterase 4 (PDE4) inhibitor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/195

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/277 (2006.01); A61K 31/357 (2006.01); A61K 31/502 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 31/5517 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/277 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0209689 A1 20020207; AR 029984 A1 20030723; AU 2001279023 B2 20051110; AU 7902301 A 20020213; BR 0112682 A 20030624; CA 2417336 A1 20020207; CN 1444476 A 20030924; CZ 20030141 A3 20040714; EP 1320361 A1 20030625; EP 1320361 A4 20060405; HU 0300685 A2 20031229; HU 0300685 A3 20041028; IL 153919 D0 20030731; JP 2004505039 A 20040219; KR 20030019620 A 20030306; MX PA03000714 A 20030604; NO 20030332 A 20030122; NO 20030332 D0 20030122; PL 365612 A1 20050110; ZA 200300476 B 20040423

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1057696

2007-08-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070208

2006-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060928

2006-04-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/44 20060101AFI20060209BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/5517 20060101ALI20060209BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/52 20060101ALI20060209BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/502 20060101ALI20060209BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/357 20060101ALI20060209BHEP

2006-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 11/00 20060101ALI20060209BHEP

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI