Global Patent Index - EP 1320368 A1

EP 1320368 A1 2003-06-25 - INFUSION SOLUTIONS OF CIPROFLOXACIN HAVING REDUCED ACID CONTENT AND BEING STABLE IN STORAGE

Title (en)

INFUSION SOLUTIONS OF CIPROFLOXACIN HAVING REDUCED ACID CONTENT AND BEING STABLE IN STORAGE

Title (de)

LAGERSTABILE INFUSIONSLÖSUNG DES CIPROFLOXACINS MIT VERRINGERTEM SÄUREGEHALT

Title (fr)

SOLUTION POUR PERFUSION DE CIPROFLOXACINE STABLE AU STOCKAGE ET A TENEUR REDUITE EN ACIDE

Publication

EP 1320368 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01983507 A

Priority

  • DE 10048510 A
  • EP 0111189 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0226233A1] The invention relates to infusions of 1-cyclopropyl-6-fluoro-1,4-dihydro-4-oxo-7-(1-piperazinyl)-quinoline-3-carboxylic acid (ciprofloxacin) which are stable in storage and which can be obtained by mixing between 0.015 and 0.5 g of active ingredient for 100 ml of aqueous solution with sulphuric acid or sodium hydrogen sulfate in a quantity equal to or less than 0.96 mole per mole of active ingredient, sufficient for dissolving the active ingredient and stabilising the solution. The invention also relates to methods for producing the infusions and the use thereof. The inventive infusions enable the acid content to be reduced, are more stable in storage with the same acid content than other known solutions, and enable a larger proportion of secondary components to be tolerated in the active ingredient than previous standard infusions of ciprofloxacins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/495; A61K 9/08; A61K 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61K 47/02 (2006.01); A61K 47/04 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0019 (2013.01); A61K 47/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0226233A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0226233 A1 20020404; WO 0226233 B1 20020704; AU 1499302 A 20020408; BR 0114293 A 20030729; CA 2420556 A1 20030225; CN 1466457 A 20040107; DE 10048510 A1 20020516; EP 1320368 A1 20030625; HU 0302256 A2 20031128; IL 154509 D0 20030917; JP 2004509921 A 20040402; KR 20030068541 A 20030821; MX PA03002770 A 20041213; NO 20031411 D0 20030327; PL 360597 A1 20040920; SK 3322003 A3 20030701; US 2004082593 A1 20040429; ZA 200301459 B 20030827

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-01-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INFUSION SOLUTIONS OF CIPROFLOXACIN HAVING REDUCED ACID CONTENT AND BEING STABLE IN STORAGE

2004-01-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INFUSION SOLUTIONS OF CIPROFLOXACIN HAVING REDUCED ACID CONTENT AND BEING STABLE IN STORAGE

2003-12-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INFUSION SOLUTIONS OF CIPROFLOXACIN HAVING REDUCED ACID CONTENT AND BEING STABLE IN STORAGE

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI