Global Patent Index - EP 1320429 A1

EP 1320429 A1 2003-06-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A FLANGE OR A RIM ON AN END OF A STEEL PIPE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A FLANGE OR A RIM ON AN END OF A STEEL PIPE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANFORMEN EINES FLANSCHES ODER BORDES AM ENDE EINES ROHRES AUS BLECH

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FORMER UN REBORD OU UN BORD A L'EXTREMITE D'UN TUBE EN TOLE

Publication

EP 1320429 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01985241 A

Priority

  • DE 10047310 A
  • EP 0110962 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224369A1] The invention relates to a method and device for forming a one-piece flange (10,18) or rim on the end of a steel (12) pipe. The pipe is placed in a flat position on all sides on the inner surface thereof close to the end thereof and is clamped. One part of the pipe (10) protrudes above the clamped section of the tube (12). The protruding part of the pipe is bent by applying surface pressure against a peripheral section on the inner surface thereof, until a desired outward flectional angle is obtained. The desired flectional angle on all parts of the pipe (10, 18) or a part-section (10) thereof is gradually achieved by rotating the pipe (12) relative to the peripheral section wherein the flection occurs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 19/00 (2006.01); B21D 19/04 (2006.01); B21D 51/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 19/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224369A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224369 A1 20020328; AT 274381 T 20040915; AU 1819102 A 20020402; BR 0114106 A 20030722; CA 2424583 A1 20030324; CN 1466499 A 20040107; CZ 20030853 A3 20031015; CZ 297829 B6 20070411; DE 10047310 A1 20020502; DE 50103424 D1 20040930; EP 1320429 A1 20030625; EP 1320429 B1 20040825; ES 2225627 T3 20050316; HU 0302953 A2 20031229; IL 155014 D0 20031031; JP 2004508936 A 20040325; KR 20030065482 A 20030806; NO 20031337 D0 20030324; PL 200911 B1 20090227; PL 359823 A1 20040906; RU 2003112016 A 20041220; US 2004089043 A1 20040513

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171003

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050125

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *METU-SYSTEM MEINIG K.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: METU-SYSTEM MEINIG K.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225627 T3

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-11-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041125

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103424 P 20040930

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-25 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040825

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030308

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI