Global Patent Index - EP 1320441 A1

EP 1320441 A1 2003-06-25 - CMP APPARATUS AND METHODS TO CONTROL THE TILT OF THE CARRIER HEAD, THE RETAINING RING AND THE PAD CONDITIONER

Title (en)

CMP APPARATUS AND METHODS TO CONTROL THE TILT OF THE CARRIER HEAD, THE RETAINING RING AND THE PAD CONDITIONER

Title (de)

CMP VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER NEIGUNG DES TRÄGERKOPFS, DES HALTERRINGS UND DES ABRICHTKOPFS

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE POLISSAGE CHIMICO-MECANIQUE ET PROCEDES DE REGLAGE D'INCLINAISON DE LA TETE DE SUPPORT, DE LA BAGUE DE RETENUE ET DU CONDITIONNEUR DE PLOT

Publication

EP 1320441 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01971321 A

Priority

  • US 0129799 W
  • US 66866700 A
  • US 66870500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224410A1] A CMP system make repeatable measurements of eccentric forces applied to carriers for wafer or conditioning pucks. Force applied to the carrier may be accurately measured even though such force is eccentrically applied to such carrier. An initial coaxial relationship between an axis of rotation and a carrier axis (212) is maintained during application of the eccentric force (FP-W), such that a sensor (263) is enabled to make repeatable measurements, of the eccentric forces, and the carrier (208) may be a wafer or a puck carrier. Such initial coaxial relationship is maintained by alinear bearing assembly (232) mounted between the carrier (208) and thsensor (263). The linear bearing assembly is provided as an array of separate linear bearing assemblies, wherein each separate linear bearing assembly is dimensioned independently of the diameter, of a wafer or puck carried by the carrier. The linear bearing assembly may be assembled with a retainer ring (282).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 37/04; B24B 41/04; B24B 41/06; B24B 53/007

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 49/16 (2006.01); B24B 37/04 (2012.01); B24B 41/04 (2006.01); B24B 41/06 (2012.01); B24B 53/007 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01); H01L 21/306 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/017 (2013.01); B24B 37/04 (2013.01); B24B 41/04 (2013.01); B24B 41/061 (2013.01); H01L 21/30625 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224410A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224410 A1 20020328; WO 0224410 A9 20030327; AU 9121801 A 20020402; EP 1320441 A1 20030625; JP 2004508962 A 20040325; KR 20030048407 A 20030619; TW 528651 B 20030421

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090127

2008-10-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB LI

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI