Global Patent Index - EP 1320446 A1

EP 1320446 A1 2003-06-25 - MACHINE TOOL WITH A CHAMBER FOR LUBRICATING AGENT AND A PRESSURE EQUALISATION DEVICE FOR SAID CHAMBER

Title (en)

MACHINE TOOL WITH A CHAMBER FOR LUBRICATING AGENT AND A PRESSURE EQUALISATION DEVICE FOR SAID CHAMBER

Title (de)

WERKZEUGMASCHINE MIT EINEM RAUM MIT SCHMIERMITTEL UND EINER DRUCKAUSGLEICHSEINRICHTUNG DES RAUMS

Title (fr)

MACHINE OUTIL COMPRENANT UNE CHAMBRE A LUBRIFIANT ET UN DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE PRESSION DESTINE A CETTE CHAMBRE

Publication

EP 1320446 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01969266 A

Priority

  • DE 0103358 W
  • DE 10045618 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222315A1] The invention relates to a machine tool, in particular a hand-operated hammer drill, comprising a chamber (10) with lubricating agent and a pressure equalising device (12, 14, 34) for the chamber (10), in the region of a bearing (16, 18, 36) for a rotating driven component (20, 22, 54). According to the invention, the bearing (16, 18, 36) forms at least part of a lubricating agent seal (24, 26, 38) for the pressure equalisation device (12, 14, 34), by means of which a pressure in the chamber (10) may be equilibrated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/00 (2006.01); B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B23B 47/00 (2006.01); B25D 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/26 (2013.01); B25D 2250/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222315A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222315 A1 20020321; DE 10045618 A1 20020404; DE 50114703 D1 20090326; EP 1320446 A1 20030625; EP 1320446 B1 20090211; JP 2004508948 A 20040325; US 2003121683 A1 20030703; US 6722449 B2 20040420

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140831

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091112

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114703 P 20090326

2009-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2009-02-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071219

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI