Global Patent Index - EP 1320463 A1

EP 1320463 A1 2003-06-25 - MACHINE FOR SEALED COVER FOR A SET OF DOCUMENTS

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR SEALED COVER FOR A SET OF DOCUMENTS

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM KUVERTIEREN EINER MENGE VON DOKUMENTEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE MISE SOUS PLI D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DOCUMENTS

Publication

EP 1320463 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01972230 A

Priority

  • FR 0103018 W
  • FR 0012479 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0226508A1] The invention concerns a machine for providing a sealed cover for documents comprising a document conveying table (18) with a general longitudinal shape, arranged upstream of a unit for inserting (20) said documents in an envelope (26), at least a contact member (40, 42) mobile longitudinally, under the action of driving means (76, 82, 84, 88) in the direction of the inserting unit and which is designed to drive the documents on the conveying table, the driving means being distant from the inserting unit. The invention is characterised in that said at least one contact member is arranged on a mobile support (44) linked to the driving means in a zone (44b) located upstream of said at least one contact member, the driving means imposing on said at least one contact member a reciprocating translational movement between two extreme positions, in one of said extreme positions said at least one contact member being placed proximate to the inserting unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 3/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0226508A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0226508 A1 20020404; CA 2423287 A1 20020404; CA 2423287 C 20101214; EP 1320463 A1 20030625; EP 1320463 B1 20130116; FR 2814699 A1 20020405; FR 2814699 B1 20030704; US 2005034433 A1 20050217; US 7448190 B2 20081111

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170928

2018-04-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60147605

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-02-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60147605

- Effective date: 20131017

2013-12-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131017

2013-03-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60147605

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2013-01-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PITNEY BOWES

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071023

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SECAP (GROUPE PITNEY BOWES)

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR