Global Patent Index - EP 1320514 A1

EP 1320514 A1 2003-06-25 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A VITROCERAMIC HOB AND VITROCERAMIC HOB PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PREPARING A VITROCERAMIC HOB AND VITROCERAMIC HOB PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER GLASKERAMIK-KOCHMULDE UND DANACH HERGESTELLTE GLASKERAMIK-KOCHMULDE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REALISER UNE CUVE DE CUISSON EN VITROCERAMIQUE ET CUVE DE CUISSON EN VITROCERAMIQUE REALISEE SELON CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1320514 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01967316 A

Priority

  • DE 10044601 A
  • EP 0110331 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222512A1] The invention relates to a method for preparing a vitroceramic hob and to a vitroceramic hob produced according to said method. The use of vitroceramics in the production of hobs that are operated with gas as an alternative to hobs from enameled sheet metal, high-grade steel or tempered flat glass is functionally (durability, cleaning behavior) and esthetically advantageous. Vitroceramic hobs are increasingly in demand on the market. The vitroceramic hobs produced according to known methods are disadvantageous in that they have a low degree of deformability. The aim of the invention is therefore to provide a hob (1) that has a more varied geometry of shapes and a constructive design that better meets the demands. In order to produce a vitroceramic hob for gas stoves, a gob of glass is fed to a press mold, said press mold representing the negative of the geometry of the hob to be produced, and the preform pressed in this manner is then ceramized. The vitroceramic hob according to the invention is a pressed element that is characterized by geometric structures (3, 4, 6, 7) that are integrally formed by pressing and that deviate from the plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 11/08; F24C 3/08; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 11/00 (2006.01); C03B 11/08 (2006.01); F24C 3/08 (2006.01); F24C 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2013.01); C03B 11/08 (2013.01); C03B 11/082 (2013.01); F24C 3/085 (2013.01); C03B 2215/40 (2013.01); C03B 2215/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0222512A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222512 A1 20020321; AU 8771601 A 20020326; CN 1213954 C 20050810; CN 1484618 A 20040324; DE 10044601 A1 20020404; DE 10044601 B4 20050609; EP 1320514 A1 20030625; JP 2004509308 A 20040325

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050928

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI