Global Patent Index - EP 1320540 A2

EP 1320540 A2 2003-06-25 - PEPTIDOMIMETIC PROTEASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

PEPTIDOMIMETIC PROTEASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

PEPTIDOMIMETIKA ALS PROTEASE INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS PEPTIDOMIMETIQUES DE PROTEASE

Publication

EP 1320540 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01968040 A

Priority

  • US 0126008 W
  • US 22939800 P
  • US 27764101 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218369A2] The present invention relates to peptidomimetic compounds useful as protease inhibitors, particularly as serine protease inhibitors and more particularly as hepatitis C NS3 protease inhibitors; intermediates thereto; their preparation including novel steroselective processes to intermediates. The invention is also directed to pharmaceutical compositions and to methods for using the compounds for inhibiting HCV protease or treating a patient suffering from an HCV infection or physiological condition related to the infection. Also provided are pharmaceutical combinations comprising, in addition to one or more HCV serine protease inhibitors, one or more interferons exhibiting anti-HCV activity and/or one or more compounds having anti HCV activity and a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier, and methods for treating or preventing a HCV infection in a patient using the compositions. The present invention is also directed to a kit or pharmaceutical pack for treating or preventing HCV infection in a patient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/99 (2006.01); A61K 31/13 (2006.01); A61K 31/437 (2006.01); A61K 31/7052 (2006.01); A61K 31/713 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/04 (2006.01); A61K 38/05 (2006.01); A61K 38/21 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 31/14 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/02 (2006.01); C07D 209/52 (2006.01); C07K 5/02 (2006.01); C07K 5/023 (2006.01); C07K 5/027 (2006.01); C07K 5/03 (2006.01); C07K 5/04 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 7/02 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/18 (2006.01); C12N 7/06 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01); A61P (2006.01); C07K (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 7/02 (2013.01); A61K 38/07 (2013.01); A61K 38/08 (2013.01); A61K 38/21 (2013.01); A61K 38/212 (2013.01); A61K 38/215 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C07D 209/02 (2013.01); C07D 209/52 (2013.01); C07K 5/0202 (2013.01); C07K 5/0205 (2013.01); C07K 5/06052 (2013.01); C07K 5/0808 (2013.01); C07K 5/101 (2013.01); C07K 5/1016 (2013.01); C07K 7/06 (2013.01); C07K 14/005 (2013.01); C12N 2770/24222 (2013.01); Y02P 20/55 (2015.11)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 38/21 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218369 A2 20020307; WO 0218369 A3 20020815; WO 0218369 A8 20031106; AR 030591 A1 20030827; AT 431358 T 20090515; AT 483686 T 20101015; AU 2001288318 B2 20070906; AU 2001288318 C1 20020313; AU 8831801 A 20020313; BR 0113666 A 20050927; CA 2419607 A1 20020307; CA 2419607 C 20120313; CA 2697205 A1 20020307; CA 2697205 C 20140729; CN 100522991 C 20090805; CN 101633636 A 20100127; CN 101633636 B 20130313; CN 101693672 A 20100414; CN 101693672 B 20141112; CN 101696232 A 20100421; CN 102504014 A 20120620; CN 103232381 A 20130807; CN 1451014 A 20031022; CN 1869061 A 20061129; CN 1869061 B 20130424; CY 1109216 T1 20140702; CZ 20030595 A3 20030618; DE 122012000015 I1 20120524; DE 20122915 U1 20100408; DE 60138717 D1 20090625; DE 60143233 D1 20101118; DK 1320540 T3 20090727; DK 1320540 T5 20120529; DK 1878720 T3 20110124; DZ 3438 A1 20020307; EA 011547 B1 20090428; EA 017556 B1 20130130; EA 200300318 A1 20040226; EA 200701869 A1 20080228; EC SP034493 A 20030425; EC SP077217 A 20070426; EP 1320540 A2 20030625; EP 1320540 B1 20090513; EP 1320540 B9 20120321; EP 1849797 A2 20071031; EP 1849797 A3 20080123; EP 1876173 A1 20080109; EP 1878720 A1 20080116; EP 1878720 B1 20101006; EP 1958956 A2 20080820; EP 1958956 A3 20080924; EP 1958956 B1 20131211; EP 2368877 A1 20110928; EP 2368877 B1 20140507; EP 2368878 A1 20110928; EP 2368901 A1 20110928; EP 2371839 A1 20111005; ES 2325481 T3 20090907; ES 2325481 T9 20120710; ES 2352804 T3 20110223; ES 2450815 T3 20140325; ES 2489115 T3 20140901; HK 1057758 A1 20091002; HK 1114090 A1 20110311; HK 1163061 A1 20150130; HR P20030139 A2 20050430; HR P20030139 B1 20150828; HR P20030139 B8 20151106; HU 0300855 A2 20031028; HU 0300855 A3 20120130; IL 154671 A 20111130; IL 154671 D0 20030917; IL 185644 D0 20080106; IL 215890 D0 20111229; IL 215891 A 20150430; IL 215891 D0 20111229; IL 215892 A 20150331; IL 215892 D0 20111229; JP 2004517047 A 20040610; JP 2007284444 A 20071101; JP 2011079835 A 20110421; JP 2012197289 A 20121018; JP 4689938 B2 20110601; JP 5269035 B2 20130821; KR 100876472 B1 20081231; KR 100945975 B1 20100309; KR 100968295 B1 20100707; KR 20030041981 A 20030527; KR 20080007515 A 20080121; KR 20080096718 A 20081031; KR 20080104382 A 20081202; KR 20080104383 A 20081202; KR 20080104384 A 20081202; KR 20090120013 A 20091123; KR 20100042296 A 20100423; KR 20100043293 A 20100428; KR 20110088600 A 20110803; LU 91960 I2 20120521; MX PA03001780 A 20030604; NO 20030928 A 20030416; NO 20030928 D0 20030227; NO 20100093 A 20030416; NO 20100999 A 20030416; NO 2012006 I1 20120430; NO 2012006 I2 20120403; NO 329929 B1 20110124; NO 330807 B1 20110718; NZ 541302 A 20070427; NZ 569670 A 20100326; PE 04742002 A1 20020618; PL 211019 B1 20120330; PL 365836 A1 20050110; PT 1320540 E 20090714; SI 1320540 T1 20091031; SK 2492003 A3 20041103; SV 2003000617 A 20030113; TW 200918523 A 20090501; TW 201022241 A 20100616; TW 201022242 A 20100616; TW 201022243 A 20100616; TW 201022244 A 20100616; TW I319763 B 20100121; TW I339661 B 20110401; TW I359144 B 20120301; TW I359145 B 20120301; TW I378927 B 20121211; UA 81600 C2 20080125; UA 99895 C2 20121025; US 2005197299 A1 20050908; US 2010137583 A1 20100603; US 2012064034 A1 20120315; US 2012282219 A1 20121108; US 2014294763 A1 20141002; US 7820671 B2 20101026; US 8252923 B2 20120828; US 8529882 B2 20130910; ZA 200301641 B 20040621

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2018-06-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-06-05 [REG SE SPCC] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE IS INVALID AS THE BASIC PATENT HAS EXPIRED BEFORE THE 20-YEAR PROTECTION PERIOD

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 1290007-2

2018-05-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20180410

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180305

2018-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-05-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2018-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 431358 T

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-04-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170901

2018-03-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-03-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-03-26 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-03-26 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Effective date: 20170831

2018-03-15 [REG AT SPCR] REVOCATION OF AN SPC

- Document: AT 431358 T

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR UND JEDE THERAPEUTISCH AEQUIVALENTE FORM DAVON, WELCHE DURCH DAS GRUNDPATENT GESCHUETZT IST, WIE PHARMAZEUTISCH VERTRAEGLICHE SALZE UND/ODER SOLVATE VON TELAPREVIR ODER SOLVATE SOLCHER SALZE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 9/2012

- Filing date: 20120416

- Expiry date: 20210831

- Extension date: 20260831

- Effective date: 20180315

2018-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60138717

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170815

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160815

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-21 [REG FI SPCG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 470

- Extension date: 20260831

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160809

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160816

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160812

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160809

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160809

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-13 [REG GB CTFG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR OR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS AND/OR SOLVATES OF TELAPREVIR OR SOLVATES OF SUCH SALTS.; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC/GB12/010

- Filing date: 20120316

- Extension date: 20260830

- Effective date: 20160311

2016-02-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-09-10 [REG FR SPCT] TOTAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Owner name: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, BE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR ET LES SELS ET/OU LES SOLVATES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES DU TELAPREVIR OU LES SOLVATES DE TELS SELS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 12C0018

- Filing date: 20120319

2015-07-31 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV; BE

- Effective date: 20150605

2015-07-06 [REG DK CTFG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) ISSUED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR OG FARMACEUTISK ACCEPTABLE SALTE OG/ELLER SOLVATER AF TELAPREVIR ELLER SOLVATER AF SADANNE SALTE; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: CR 2012 00007

- Filing date: 20120319

- Expiry date: 20210831

- Extension date: 20260831

2015-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED, US

2015-05-15 [REG CH SPCM] CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED, US

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C01320540/01

2015-02-13 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20150113

2014-12-31 [REG CH SPCG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 62082 08.09.2011

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C01320540/01

- Filing date: 20120308

- Extension date: 20260830

2014-12-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, BE

- Effective date: 20141124

2014-12-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20141113 AND 20141119

2014-12-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED, 02139 CAMBRIDGE, MASS., US

- Document: DE 60138717

- Effective date: 20141023

2014-12-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60138717

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20141023

2014-11-04 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV, BE

- Effective date: 20141023

2014-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60138717

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2014-04-09 [REG IE SPCG] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR, OPTIONALLY IN THE FORM OF A PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALT AND/OR SOLVATE THEREOF OR SOLVATES OF SUCH SALTS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 2012/009

- Extension date: 20260830

- Effective date: 20140313

2013-01-11 [REG FR AV] OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT

- Effective date: 20121212

2012-12-10 [REG FR CT] GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FOR MEDICINE (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR ET LES SELS ET/OU LES SOLVATES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES DU TELAPREVIR OU LES SOLVATES DE TELS SELS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 12C0018

- Filing date: 20120319

- Extension date: 20260830

2012-10-23 [REG SE SPCG] GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR OCH FARMACEUTISKT GODTAGBARA SALTER OCH/ELLER SOLVAT AV TELAPREVIR ELLER SOLVAT AV SADANA SALTER; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 1290007-2

- Expiry date: 20210901

- Extension date: 20260831

2012-09-25 [REG LT SPCG] GRANT OF AN SPC

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIRUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: PA2012003,C1320540

- Filing date: 20120316

- Expiry date: 20210831

- Extension date: 20260901

2012-09-05 [REG NL KC1] GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR, DESGEWENST IN DE VORM VAN EEN FARMACEUTISCH AANVAARDBAAR ZOUT EN/OF SOLVAAT DAARVAN, OF SOLVATEN VAN DERGELIJKE ZOUTEN; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 2011190919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C300518

- Filing date: 20120319

- Extension date: 20260830

2012-05-29 [REG DK T5] CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-05-21 [REG LU CCP] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: 91960, EXPIRES: 20260831

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 91960

- Expiry date: 20260831

2012-05-14 [REG DK CTFF] APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: CA 2012 00007

- Filing date: 20120319

- Expiry date: 20260831

2012-05-01 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

2012-04-25 [REG LT SPCF] FILING AN SPC

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIRUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: PA2012003

- Filing date: 20120316

- Expiry date: 20210831

2012-04-20 [REG FR CP] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED

- Effective date: 20120321

2012-04-20 [REG FR CP] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR ET TOUTES SES FORMES THERAPEUTIQUEMENT EQUIVALENTES PROTEGEES PAR LE BREVET DE BASE, TELLES QUE LES SELS ET/OU LES SOLVATES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES DU TELAPREVIR OU LES SOLVATES DE TELS SELS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 12C0018

- Filing date: 20120319

2012-04-20 [REG FR CR] SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION LAID OPEN TO THE PUBLIC (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR ET TOUTES SES FORMES THERAPEUTIQUEMENT EQUIVALENTES PROTEGEES PAR LE BREVET DE BASE, TELLES QUE LES SELS ET/OU LES SOLVATES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES DU TELAPREVIR OU LES SOLVATES D...; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: EU/1/11/720/001 DU 20110919; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: EU/1/11/720/001 DU 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 12C0018

- Filing date: 20120319

2012-04-11 [REG GB CTFF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR AND EVERY THERAPEUTICALLY EQUIVALENT FORM THEREOF PROTECTED BY THE BASIC PATENT, SUCH AS PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS AND/OR SOLVATES OF TELAPREVIR OR SOLVATES OF SUCH SALTS.; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC/GB12/010

- Filing date: 20120316

2012-04-11 [REG IE SPCF] REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: SPC009/2012: 20120316

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: SPC009/2012

- Filing date: 20120316

2012-04-11 [REG IE SPCF] REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR AND EVERY THERAPEUTICALLY EQUIVALENT FORM THEREOF PROTECTED BY THE BASIC PATENT, SUCH AS PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS AND/OR SOLVATES OF TELAPREVIR OR SOLVATES OF SUCH SALTS.; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 2012/009

- Filing date: 20120316

2012-04-10 [REG SE SPCF] APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR OCH VARJE TERAPEUTISK EKVIVALENT DAERAV SOM SKYDDAS AV GRUNDPATENTET, SA SOM FARMACEUTISKA GODTAGBARA SALTER OCH/ELLER SOLVAT AV TELAPREVIR ELLER SOLVAT AV SADANA SALTER; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: 1290007-2

2012-03-28 [REG NL KC1] GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR EN IEDER THERAPEUTISCH EQUIVALENTE VORM DAARVAN BESCHERMD DOOR HET BASISOCTROOI, ZOALS FARMACEUTISCH AANVAARDBARE ZOUTEN EN/OF SOLVATEN VAN TELAPREVIR OF SOLVATEN VAN DERGELIJKE ZOUTEN; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/11/720/001 20110919

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C300518

- Filing date: 20120319

- Extension date: 20260830

2012-03-16 [REG FI SPCF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED

- SPC supplementary protection certificate: C20120011

2012-03-15 [REG CH SPCF] SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED

- Free text: PRODUCT NAME: TELAPREVIR; REGISTRATION NUMBER/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 62082 08.09.2011

2010-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100216

2009-10-02 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1057758

2009-09-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-09-07 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2325481 T3

2009-08-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090401726

2009-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2009-07-27 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2009-07-14 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20090707

2009-06-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60138717 P 20090625

2009-06-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2009-05-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051208

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI