Global Patent Index - EP 1320564 A1

EP 1320564 A1 2003-06-25 - MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM WHICH CAN BE HARDENED BY MEANS OF HEAT AND ACTINIC RADIATION, AND USE OF THE SAME

Title (en)

MULTICOMPONENT SYSTEM WHICH CAN BE HARDENED BY MEANS OF HEAT AND ACTINIC RADIATION, AND USE OF THE SAME

Title (de)

THERMISCH UND MIT AKTINISCHER STRAHLUNG HÄRTBARES MEHRKOMPONENTENSYSTEM UND SEINE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME MULTICOMPOSANT DURCISSABLE PAR VOIE THERMIQUE ET AU MOYEN D'UN RAYONNEMENT ACTINIQUE, ET UTILISATION DUDIT SYSTEME

Publication

EP 1320564 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01985715 A

Priority

  • DE 10048275 A
  • EP 0111104 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0226853A1] The invention relates to a multicomponent system which can be hardened by means of heat and actinic radiation (Dual Cure). The inventive system contains (A) at least one component comprising at least one constituent which has at least one isocyanate reactive functional group and at least one functional group having at least one bond which can be activated by actinic radiation, in addition to at least one vinylaromatic allylalcohol copolymer, and (B) at least one component containing at least one polyisocyanate. The invention also relates to the use of said system as coating material, adhesive and sealant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/62; C08G 18/81; C09D 175/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/62 (2006.01); C08G 18/81 (2006.01); C09D 175/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 175/16 (2013.01); C08G 18/6212 (2013.01); C08G 18/6229 (2013.01); C08G 18/8116 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0226853A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0226853 A1 20020404; AU 2056802 A 20020408; DE 10048275 C1 20020529; EP 1320564 A1 20030625; US 2004039103 A1 20040226; US 7037972 B2 20060502

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-28 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASF COATINGS GMBH

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080505

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI