Global Patent Index - EP 1320576 A2

EP 1320576 A2 2003-06-25 - BIODEGRADABLE FUNCTIONAL FLUID FOR MECHANIC DRIVES

Title (en)

BIODEGRADABLE FUNCTIONAL FLUID FOR MECHANIC DRIVES

Title (de)

BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE FUNKTIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR MECHANISCHE ANTRIEBE

Title (fr)

LIQUIDE FONCTIONNEL BIODEGRADABLE POUR ENTRAINEMENTS MECANIQUES

Publication

EP 1320576 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01985265 A

Priority

  • DE 0103672 W
  • DE 10049175 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224841A2] The invention relates to a water-based biodegradable functional liquid for mechanical drives, preferably for use in steam engines. The aim of the invention is to create functional liquids for use in mechanical drives, particularly for hydrodynamically lubricating plain bearings, preferably for crankshafts of superheated steam engines having customary non-overly precise bearing play. The inventive liquids should be able to be used in closed power pack systems also in the existence of sump temperatures exceeding 120 DEG C, e.g. in the lubricant pan located under a crank drive and be water-based or able to be diluted with water. According to the invention, this is achieved by a percentually low addition of polyaspartic acid to water or to water-glycol mixtures, whereby polyaspartic acid having a molar mass ranging from 1,000 to 10,000 g/mol is preferably used.

[origin: WO0224841A2] The invention relates to a water-based biodegradable functional fluid for mechanical drives, preferably for use in steam engines. The aim of the invention is to create functional fluids for use in mechanical drives, particularly for hydrodynamically lubricating plain bearings, preferably for crankshafts of superheated steam engines having customary non-overly precise bearing play. The inventive fluids should be able to be used in closed power pack systems also in the existence of sump temperatures exceeding 120 DEG C, e.g. in the lubricant pan located under a crank drive and be water-based or able to be diluted with water. According to the invention, this is achieved by a percentually low addition of polyaspartic acid to water or to water-glycol mixtures, whereby polyaspartic acid having a molar mass greater than 1,000 and up to 10,000 g/mol is preferably used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04; C10M 173/02; C10N 30/04; C10N 30/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 173/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/041 (2013.01); C10M 105/14 (2013.01); C10M 107/34 (2013.01); C10M 129/20 (2013.01); C10M 145/26 (2013.01); C10M 145/28 (2013.01); C10M 145/38 (2013.01); C10M 149/14 (2013.01); C10M 149/18 (2013.01); C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2207/0225 (2013.01); C10M 2207/044 (2013.01); C10M 2209/103 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1055 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2209/109 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1095 (2013.01); C10M 2217/00 (2013.01); C10M 2217/02 (2013.01); C10M 2217/04 (2013.01); C10M 2217/041 (2013.01); C10M 2217/044 (2013.01); C10M 2217/045 (2013.01); C10N 2220/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/14 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224841A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224841 A2 20020328; WO 0224841 A3 20030213; DE 10049175 A1 20020425; EP 1320576 A2 20030625; US 2004094743 A1 20040520; US 2005143264 A1 20050630; US 6913707 B2 20050705; US 7060199 B2 20060613

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110105

2010-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M 169/04 20060101AFI20100730BHEP

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050419

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR