Global Patent Index - EP 1320613 A2

EP 1320613 A2 2003-06-25 - ISOLATED HUMAN KINASE PROTEINS, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING HUMAN KINASE PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

ISOLATED HUMAN KINASE PROTEINS, NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING HUMAN KINASE PROTEINS, AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

ISOLIERTE HUMANE KINASEPROTEINE, DAFÜR KODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROTEINES KINASES HUMAINES ISOLEES, MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CODANT POUR CES PROTEINES ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLES-CI

Publication

EP 1320613 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01973147 A

Priority

  • US 0129161 W
  • US 23349300 P
  • US 24703100 P
  • US 72999500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0224920A2] The present invention provides amino acid sequences of peptides that are encoded by genes within the human genome, the kinase peptides of the present invention. The present invention specifically provides isolated peptide and nucleic acid molecules, methods of identifying orthologs and paralogs of the kinase peptides, and methods of identifying modulators of the kinase peptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/54; A01K 67/027; C07K 16/40; C12N 5/10; C12N 9/12; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12M 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/54 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1205 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0224920A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0224920 A2 20020328; WO 0224920 A3 20030313; AU 9275501 A 20020402; CA 2422549 A1 20020328; EP 1320613 A2 20030625; JP 2004531202 A 20041014

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: APPLERA CORPORATION

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040517

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEASLEY, ELLEN M.,C/O CELERA GENOMICS

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEI, MING-HUI,C/O CELERA GENOMICS

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DI FRANCESCO, VALENTINA,C/O CELERA GENOMICS

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI