Global Patent Index - EP 1320616 A2

EP 1320616 A2 2003-06-25 - SEQUENCES WHICH CODE FOR THE SIGE GENE OF CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM

Title (en)

SEQUENCES WHICH CODE FOR THE SIGE GENE OF CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM

Title (de)

GENSEQUENZEN FÜR SIGE VON CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES CODANT LE GENE SIGE DE CORYNEBACTERIUM GLUTAMICUM

Publication

EP 1320616 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01965132 A

Priority

  • DE 10043336 A
  • DE 10126422 A
  • EP 0108146 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218428A2] The invention relates to an isolated polynucleotide comprising a polynucleotide sequence chosen from the group consisting of a) polynucleotide which is identical to the extent of at least 70% to a polynucleotide which codes for a polypeptide which comprises the amino acid sequence of SEQ ID No. 2, b) polynucleotide which codes for a polypeptide which comprises an amino acid sequence which is identical to the extent of at least 70% to the amino acid sequence of SEQ ID No. 2, c) polynucleotide which is complementary to the polynucleotides of a) or b), and d) polynucleotide comprising at least 15 successive nucleotides of the polynucleotide sequence of a), b) or c), and a process for the fermentative preparation of L-amino acids using coryneform bacteria in which at least the sigE gene is present in enhanced form, and the use of polynucleotides which comprise the sequences according to the invention as hybridization probes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/67; C07K 14/34; C12N 1/21; C12P 13/04; C12P 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/34 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12P 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12R 1/15 (2013.01); C07K 14/34 (2013.01); C12P 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218428A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218428 A2 20020307; WO 0218428 A3 20020606; AU 8584301 A 20020313; EP 1320616 A2 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH

2007-11-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH

2007-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA GMBH

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI