Global Patent Index - EP 1320621 A2

EP 1320621 A2 2003-06-25 - ENHANCED FIRST GENERATION ADENOVIRUS VACCINES EXPRESSING CODON OPTIMIZED HIV1-GAG, POL, NEF AND MODIFICATIONS

Title (en)

ENHANCED FIRST GENERATION ADENOVIRUS VACCINES EXPRESSING CODON OPTIMIZED HIV1-GAG, POL, NEF AND MODIFICATIONS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE ADENOVIRALE VAKZINE DER ERSTEN GENERATION ZUR EXPRESSION CODON-OPTIMIERTEN HIV1-GAG, POL, NEF UND MODIFIKATIONEN(25.03.02)

Title (fr)

VACCINS ADENOVIRAUX DE PREMIERE GENERATION EVOLUES, EXPRIMANT LES PROTEINES GAG, POL ET NEF DU VIH-1 A OPTIMISATION DES CODONS ET LEURS MODIFICATIONS

Publication

EP 1320621 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01975214 A

Priority

  • US 0128861 W
  • US 23318000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0222080A2] First generation adenoviral vectors and associated recombinant adenovirus-based HIV vaccines which show enhanced stability and growth properties and greater cellular-mediated immunity are described within this specification. These adenoviral vectors are utilized to generate and produce through cell culture various adenoviral-based HIV-1 vaccines which contain HIV-1 gag, HIV-1 pol and/or HIV-1 nef polynucleotide pharmaceutical products, and biologically relevant modifications thereof. These adenovirus vaccines, when directly introduced into living vertebrate tissue, preferably a mammalian host such as a human or a non-human mammal of commercial or domestic veterinary importance, express the HIV1- Gag, Pol and/or Nef protein or biologically modification thereof, inducing a cellular immune response which specifically recognizes HIV-1. The exemplified polynucleotides of the present invention are synthetic DNA molecules encoding HIV-1 Gag, encoding codon optimized HIV-1 Pol, derivatives of optimized HIV-1 Pol (including constructs wherein protease, reverse transcriptase, RNAse H and integrase activity of HIV-1 Pol is inactivated), HIV-1 Nef and derivatives of optimized HIV-1 Nef, including nef mutants which effect wild type characteristics of Nef, such as myristylation and down regulation of host CD4. The adenoviral vaccines of the present invention, when administered alone or in a combined modality regime, will offer a prophylactic advantage to previously uninfected individuals and/or provide a therapeutic effect by reducing viral load levels within an infected individual, thus prolonging the asymptomatic phase of HIV-1 infection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/235 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/16 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01); C12N 7/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/861 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/93 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 7/00 (2013.01); C07K 14/005 (2013.01); C12N 15/86 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5256 (2013.01); A61K 2039/53 (2013.01); A61K 2039/545 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10343 (2013.01); C12N 2710/10351 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16134 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16334 (2013.01); C12N 2830/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0222080 A2 20020321; WO 0222080 A3 20020502; WO 0222080 A8 20030116; WO 0222080 A9 20030306; AU 2001294562 B2 20070524; AU 2001294562 B8 20020326; AU 9456201 A 20020326; CA 2422882 A1 20020321; EP 1320621 A2 20030625; EP 1320621 A4 20051123; JP 2004508064 A 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080805

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061017

2005-11-23 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20051007

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EMINI, EMILIO, A.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOUIL, RIMA

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BETT, ANDREW, J.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHEN, LING

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KASLOW, DAVID, C.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIVER, JOHN, W.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TONER, TIMOTHY, J.

2003-08-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CASIMIRO, DANILO, R.

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI