Global Patent Index - EP 1320623 A1

EP 1320623 A1 2003-06-25 - PROMOTER SEQUENCES

Title (en)

PROMOTER SEQUENCES

Title (de)

PROMOTERSEQUENZEN

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES DE PROMOTEURS

Publication

EP 1320623 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01972843 A

Priority

  • SE 0102098 W
  • SE 0003435 A
  • SE 0004102 A
  • US 23889700 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0227008A1] The present invention relates to an isolated promoter region of the mammalian transcription factor FOXC2. The invention also relates to screening methods for agents modulating the expression of FOXC2 and thereby being potentially useful for the treatment of medical conditions related to obesity. The invention further relates to a previously unknown variant of the human FOXC2 gene, derived via the use of an alternative promoter, which produces an additional exon that generates a distinct open reading frame via splicing. The alternative gene encodes a variant of the FOXC2 transcription factor, which is lacking a part of the DNA-binding domain and consequently has a potential regulatory function.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/87; C07K 14/47; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/85 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6897 (2013.01); C12N 2830/001 (2013.01); C12N 2830/85 (2013.01); G01N 2500/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227008A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0227008 A1 20020404; AU 9248101 A 20020408; CA 2421620 A1 20020404; EP 1320623 A1 20030625; JP 2004510417 A 20040408

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071210

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEANGENE AB

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENERBAECK, SVEN

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KROOK, KATARINA

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RONDAHL, LENA

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WASSERMAN, WYETH, W.

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI