Global Patent Index - EP 1320653 A1

EP 1320653 A1 2003-06-25 - CLOSURE SYSTEM FOR MOBILE PROTECTING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CLOSURE SYSTEM FOR MOBILE PROTECTING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHLIESSSYSTEM FÜR BEWEGLICHE SCHUTZHAUBE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE POUR PROTECTEUR MOBILE

Publication

EP 1320653 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01972196 A

Priority

  • FR 0102962 W
  • FR 0012150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225043A1] The invention concerns a closure system for a mobile protecting system (3) of access to a protected zone comprising a fixed security structure (1) wherewith the protecting system (3) co-operates between a position locking the access wherein the slide bolt (5) borne by the protecting system (3), can co-operate through one end with a lock-bolt receiver borne by the fixed structure and a plurality of unlocking positions wherein the slide bolt (5) cannot co-operate with the lock-bolt receiver (8), wherein the slide bolt is secured to a key (14) capable of being engaged in translation in the opening (20) of a safety switch (20) by means of a connecting device whereby, whatever the unlocking position of the protecting system (3), the key (14) is partly engaged in the switch (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 19/00; F16P 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 19/00 (2006.01); F16P 3/08 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16P 3/08 (2013.01); E05C 19/003 (2013.01); E05B 17/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225043A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR LI LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225043 A1 20020328; AU 9198301 A 20020402; EP 1320653 A1 20030625; FR 2814486 A1 20020329; FR 2814486 B1 20021213

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI LU

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI