Global Patent Index - EP 1320655 A1

EP 1320655 A1 2003-06-25 - SYSTEM FOR DRIVING AND GUIDING A SLIDING PANE, RETRACTABLE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE BODY CASING

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR DRIVING AND GUIDING A SLIDING PANE, RETRACTABLE IN A MOTOR VEHICLE BODY CASING

Title (de)

ANTRIEBS-UND FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM EINES SCHIEBEFENSTERS, WELCHES IN EINEN KAROSSERIEKASTEN EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES VERSENKBAR IST

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT ET DE GUIDAGE D'UNE VITRE COULISSANTE, ESCAMOTABLE DANS UN CAISSON DE CARROSSERIE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1320655 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01974409 A

Priority

  • FR 0103013 W
  • FR 0012431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0227131A1] The invention concerns a system, wherein the door casing does not comprise casing slide rails and at least one of the guide members of the sliding pane (3) comprises either a part (4a-4b) of the slide (4) of the pane frame, which is integral with said slide and extends it inside the door casing (2), or a part of said pane frame slide, arranged in its extension, but separate therefrom, said slide part (4a-4b) being mounted in either case in standard fashion on the corresponding edge of the pane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48; E05F 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 1/17 (2006.01); E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/488 (2013.01); E05F 15/689 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/642 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227131A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0227131 A1 20020404; AU 9393301 A 20020408; EP 1320655 A1 20030625; FR 2814772 A1 20020405; FR 2814772 B1 20030627; JP 2004510085 A 20040402; US 2003029092 A1 20030213

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111018

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES GB IT LI

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020625

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI