Global Patent Index - EP 1320661 A1

EP 1320661 A1 2003-06-25 - GAS TURBINE BLADE

Title (en)

GAS TURBINE BLADE

Title (de)

GASTURBINENSCHAUFEL

Title (fr)

AUBE DE TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 1320661 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01980405 A

Priority

  • EP 01980405 A
  • EP 0110789 W
  • EP 00120926 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1191189A1] A meander-form cooling passage (21) is formed inside the turbine blade and consists of sections orientated along the blade's axis (3). The first section (23) has an impingement cooling insert (37) with its front side (39) orientated to the blade's leading edge (8) extending parallel to it. The impingement cooling insert tapers in the direction of the cooling fluid outlet (35) of the first section of the cooling passage. The insert covers the whole of the cooling fluid inlet area (33) of this section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 9/02 (2006.01); F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/189 (2013.01); F05D 2260/201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227146A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191189 A1 20020327; DE 50113551 D1 20080320; EP 1320661 A1 20030625; EP 1320661 B1 20080130; JP 2004510091 A 20040402; JP 4669202 B2 20110413; US 2004022630 A1 20040205; US 6874988 B2 20050405; WO 0227146 A1 20020404

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160918

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160918

2017-06-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160918

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50113551

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-09-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-09-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080427

2008-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113551 P 20080320

2008-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-01-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR