Global Patent Index - EP 1320665 A1

EP 1320665 A1 2003-06-25 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS AND STEAM TURBINE SYSTEM AND A CORRESPONDING SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS AND STEAM TURBINE SYSTEM AND A CORRESPONDING SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER GAS- UND DAMPFTURBINENANLAGE SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE ANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'EXPLOITATION D'UNE INSTALLATION DE TURBINES A VAPEUR ET A GAZ ET INSTALLATION CORRESPONDANTE

Publication

EP 1320665 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01978376 A

Priority

  • EP 01978376 A
  • EP 0110749 W
  • EP 00121502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1193373A1] Method used for operating a gas and steam turbine system (1) comprises feeding the flue gas (AM) exiting from the gas turbine (2) operated by gas and oil over a waste-heat steam generator (30) whose heating surfaces are connected in the water/steam circuit of a steam turbine (20) having a number of pressure stages (20a, 20b, 20c). In the waste-heat steam generator, preheated condensate is heated as feed water (S) under high pressure and fed as steam (F) to the steam turbine. When operation changes from gas to oil a partial stream (tS) of heated feed water (S') is injected into the cold condensate (K). An Independent claim is also included for a gas and steam turbine system. Preferred Features: A partial stream is removed from a high pressure stage (50) and/or a medium pressure stage (70) of the water/steam circuit, from the output side of a high pressure economizer (51, 52) or medium pressure economizer (73), or from a high pressure drum (54) or medium pressure drum (75) connected in the water/steam circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 23/10; B01F 3/08; B01F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); F01K 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/0453 (2013.01); B01F 3/0865 (2013.01); B01F 3/088 (2013.01); B01F 15/026 (2013.01); F01K 23/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227154A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IE PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1193373 A1 20020403; DE 50106221 D1 20050616; EP 1320665 A1 20030625; EP 1320665 B1 20050511; ES 2240527 T3 20051016; TW 541392 B 20030711; US 2004011049 A1 20040122; US 6874322 B2 20050405; WO 0227154 A1 20020404

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-10-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141010

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130917

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50106221

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130917

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121016

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120917

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2005-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-10-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2240527 T3

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106221 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IE PT

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IE PT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR