Global Patent Index - EP 1320780 A1

EP 1320780 A1 2003-06-25 - TERMINAL WITH A PROJECTION DISPLAY

Title (en)

TERMINAL WITH A PROJECTION DISPLAY

Title (de)

ENDGERÄT MIT PROJEKTIONSDISPLAY

Title (fr)

TERMINAL A AFFICHAGE PAR PROJECTION

Publication

EP 1320780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00981133 A

Priority

DE 0003415 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0227387A1] The invention relates to a mobile data and/or communication terminal (EG). According to the invention, an optical system (OT), for the generation of a projected display (PD) and a means for stabilisation of said display (PD), on moving the terminal (EG), are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 27/64; G01C 5/02; H04N 5/232

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 21/00 (2006.01); G02B 27/64 (2006.01); G03B 21/14 (2006.01); G03B 21/26 (2006.01); H04N 5/232 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04N 5/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 9/317 (2013.01); G02B 27/646 (2013.01); G03B 17/54 (2013.01); G03B 21/14 (2013.01); H04N 5/23293 (2013.01); H04N 9/3173 (2013.01); H04N 9/3194 (2013.01); G03B 2205/0007 (2013.01); H04M 1/0202 (2013.01); H04M 1/0272 (2013.01); H04N 5/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227387A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0227387 A1 20020404; EP 1320780 A1 20030625; JP 2004527779 A 20040909; US 2009009666 A1 20090108; US 7385620 B1 20080610; US 8089504 B2 20120103

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110526

2010-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.

2008-12-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PALM, INC.

2008-08-20 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20081103

2007-02-28 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-28 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20070702

2006-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BENQ MOBILE GMBH & CO. OHG

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE