Global Patent Index - EP 1320804 A2

EP 1320804 A2 2003-06-25 - MEMORY MODULE HAVING BUFFER FOR ISOLATING STACKED MEMORY DEVICES

Title (en)

MEMORY MODULE HAVING BUFFER FOR ISOLATING STACKED MEMORY DEVICES

Title (de)

SPEICHERMODUL MIT DURCH EIN PUFFER ISOLIERETE GESTAPELTE SPEICHERBAUSTEINE

Title (fr)

MODULE DE MEMOIRE COMPORTANT UNE MEMOIRE TAMPON D'ISOLATION D'UNE MEMOIRE A PLAQUES SUPERPOSEES

Publication

EP 1320804 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01968854 A

Priority

  • US 0128627 W
  • US 23259600 P
  • US 66652800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225454A2] The present invention utilizes a buffer to isolate a stack of memory devices, thereby taking advantage of the increased memory density available from stacked memory devices while reducing capacitive loading. A memory module in accordance with the present invention may include a stack of memory devices and a buffer coupled to the first and second memory devices and arranged to capacitively isolate the first and second memory devices from a bus. In a memory system in accordance with the present invention, multiple buffered stacks of memory devices are preferably coupled in a point-to-point arrangement, thereby further reducing capacitive loading.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 5/06 (2013.01); G11C 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225454A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225454 A2 20020328; WO 0225454 A3 20020822; AU 8906701 A 20020402; CN 1484833 A 20040324; EP 1320804 A2 20030625; KR 100554081 B1 20060222; KR 20030048036 A 20030618; TW 528948 B 20030421

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-04-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1056930

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040304

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI