Global Patent Index - EP 1320806 A1

EP 1320806 A1 2003-06-25 - SEGMENTING ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS FOR USE ON A DEVICE OF LIMITED CAPABILITY

Title (en)

SEGMENTING ELECTRONIC DOCUMENTS FOR USE ON A DEVICE OF LIMITED CAPABILITY

Title (de)

SEGMENTIERUNG ELEKTRONISCHER DOKUMENTE ZUR VERWENDUNG AUF EINEM GERÄT MIT BEGRENZTER FÄHIGKEIT

Title (fr)

SEGMENTATION DE DOCUMENTS ELECTRONIQUES POUVANT ETRE UTILISES SUR UN DISPOSITIF A CAPACITE LIMITEE

Publication

EP 1320806 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01975565 A

Priority

  • US 0130465 W
  • US 23555100 P
  • US 23842400 P
  • US 74528900 A
  • US 74529000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0227516A1] A method that includes altering portions of a text of an original version of a digital document to produce a revised version of the digital document in which the text is shorter than the text of the original document, receiving over a communication channel (14) a request for the digital document from a device (10) connected to the channel (14), and transmitting the revised version over the communication channel (14) in response to the request.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/173

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30905 (2013.01); H04L 67/02 (2013.01); H04L 67/04 (2013.01); H04L 67/06 (2013.01); H04L 67/142 (2013.01); H04L 67/2823 (2013.01); H04L 67/2828 (2013.01); H04L 67/303 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); H04W 28/06 (2013.01); H04W 28/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0227516 A1 20020404; WO 0227516 A9 20030220; AU 9488101 A 20020408; AU 9488401 A 20020408; CA 2423611 A1 20020404; CA 2423611 C 20110308; CA 2423695 A1 20020404; EP 1320806 A1 20030625; EP 1320806 A4 20070815; EP 1330723 A1 20030730; EP 1330723 A4 20090401; JP 2004510251 A 20040402; JP 2004510253 A 20040402; KR 100855997 B1 20080903; KR 100903528 B1 20090619; KR 20030045086 A 20030609; KR 20030060899 A 20030716; KR 20080067022 A 20080717; WO 0227520 A1 20020404; WO 0227520 A9 20020606

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120403

2008-10-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA INC.

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080721

2007-08-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070712

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI