Global Patent Index - EP 1320809 A1

EP 1320809 A1 2003-06-25 - AUTOMATIC FIND AND DIAL

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC FIND AND DIAL

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES SUCHEN UND WÄHLEN

Title (fr)

RECHERCHE ET COMPOSITION AUTOMATIQUES

Publication

EP 1320809 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01910731 A

Priority

  • US 0104845 W
  • US 66556000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0225478A1] A combination wireless telephone (100) and personal digital assistant (PDA) has a touch screen (110) with text. The user selects a block of the text (112) and touches a find-and-dial soft key (116). The combination finds the first node designator (telephone number, e-mail address, etc.) in the block of text and access the node (dials the number, sets up an e-mail message, etc.).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/27 (2006.01); H04M 1/2745 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/277 (2013.01); H04M 1/27455 (2013.01); H04M 1/72522 (2013.01); H04M 1/72547 (2013.01); H04M 1/72561 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0225478A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0225478 A1 20020328; AU 3831001 A 20020402; EP 1320809 A1 20030625; KR 20030079916 A 20031010; MX PA03002304 A 20030910

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1058558

2008-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070118

2004-05-21 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1058558

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SPRIGG, STEPHEN, A.

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARK, CHRISTINE

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KENAGY, JASON, B.

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI