Global Patent Index - EP 1320821 A1

EP 1320821 A1 2003-06-25 - METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING IMAGES VIA A NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DISTRIBUTING IMAGES VIA A NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERTREIBEN VON BILDERN ÜBER EIN NETZWERK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION D'IMAGES AU MOYEN D'UN RESEAU

Publication

EP 1320821 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01972070 A

Priority

  • DE 10046011 A
  • EP 0110791 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2004039653A1] A method for the distribution of pictures over a network, whereby a supplier computer, a web shop computer and a customer computer are connected to the network, whereby a supplier makes a large number of pictures accessible via the network and the purchase is possible via a web shop and whereby the method exhibits the following steps: saving of digital data, which represent the supplier's pictures in a storage device of the supplier computer; assignment of at least one hyperlink to the digital data, whereby the at least one hyperlink is used for initiating an order method for the ordering of at least one picture and refers or contains information which refers to the web shop computer; establishing of a connection between the customer computer and the supplier computer via the network; reading out of the data saved in the storage device of the supplier computer and displaying of the appropriate pictures and the at least one assigned hyperlink on a display device of the customer computer; activation of the hyperlink by the customer for ordering at least one picture; establishment of a connection in response to the activation of the hyperlink between the customer computer and the web shop computer via the network for initiating the order method; execution of the order method and sending of a confirmation query from the web shop computer to the customer computer including reference data which represent the at least one ordered picture; reception of the confirmation query by the customer computer and sending of a confirmation message from the customer computer to the web shop computer for the case where the appropriate order is to be executed; establishment of a connection between the web shop computer and the supplier computer via the network in response to a positive confirmation by the customer; reading out of those digital data which represent the at least one ordered picture by the web shop computer from the storage device of the supplier computer; and processing of the read-out picture data according to the customer's desired picture format.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0625 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0635 (2013.01); G06Q 30/0641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0223415 A2 20020321; AU 9187201 A 20020326; DE 10046011 A1 20020404; EP 1320821 A1 20030625; US 2004039653 A1 20040226; US 7376594 B2 20080520

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-01-25 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-03-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090213

2007-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030410

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI