Global Patent Index - EP 1320843 A1

EP 1320843 A1 2003-06-25 - RATIONAL INQUIRY METHOD

Title (en)

RATIONAL INQUIRY METHOD

Title (de)

RATIONELLES ANFRAGEVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INVESTIGATION RATIONNELLE

Publication

EP 1320843 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00975629 A

Priority

  • US 0040818 W
  • US 65442300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0221481A1] The present invention relates generally to a method for personal and group improvement. Rational inquiry (10) includes a plurality of questions, methods and observations leading to answers, meanings, ethics, personal essence, purpose and a greater awareness. The questions and observations in the method are provided to the individual in a matrix or a plurality of modules, including practices and inquiries. The matrix or modules, including practices and inquiries are used to assists the individual in determining a minimally assumptive matrix of consistent human internal existence and determining a minimally assumptive matrix of consistent reality. If through comparison of the minimally assumptive matrices, a difference is detected, a disintegration is said to occur. The disintegration is removed by allowing the individual to integrate through a more complete awareness of a limiting belief.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G09B 7/02 (2006.01); G09B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09B 19/00 (2013.01); G09B 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0221481 A1 20020314; AU 1365001 A 20020322; BR 0017330 A2 20090310; CA 2421454 A1 20020314; CN 101299303 A 20081105; CN 1457478 A 20031119; EP 1320843 A1 20030625; EP 1320843 A4 20070404; JP 2004508645 A 20040318; MX PA03001749 A 20041101; ZA 200301734 B 20030909

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130520

2013-05-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090402

2007-04-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070306

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIRST PRINCIPLES, INC.

2003-10-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RANIERE, KEITH

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI