Global Patent Index - EP 1320857 A2

EP 1320857 A2 2003-06-25 - ILLUMINATION SYSTEM PARTICULARLY FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY

Title (en)

ILLUMINATION SYSTEM PARTICULARLY FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY

Title (de)

BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM INSBESONDERE FÜR MIKROLITHOGRAPHIE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LA MICROLITHOGRAPHIE

Publication

EP 1320857 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01985764 A

Priority

  • DE 20100123 U
  • DE 10100265 A
  • EP 0111224 W
  • US 67971800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0227405A2] The invention concerns an illumination system, particularly for microlithography with wavelengths </= 193 nm, comprising: a primary light source; a first optical component; a second optical component; an image plane; and an exit pupil, wherein said first optical component transforms said primary light source into a plurality of secondary light sources that are imaged by said second optical component in said exit pupil, wherein said first optical component includes a first optical element having a plurality of first raster elements that are imaged into said image plane, producing a plurality of images being superimposed, at least partially, on a field in said image plane, wherein said first optical component comprises a collector unit and a second optical element having a plurality of second raster elements, said illumination system further comprising: a first optical axis between said collector unit and said first optical element, wherein said first optical element is reflective; a second optical axis between said first optical element and said second optical element, wherein said second optical element is reflective; and a third optical axis between said second optical element and said second optical component, wherein the directional vector of the first optical axis and the directional vector of the second optical axis define a plane and wherein said first and second optical elements are tilted to cause a crossing of the projection of said third optical axis in to said plane and said first optical axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 5/04; G03F 7/20; G21K 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 19/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01); G21K 1/06 (2006.01); G21K 5/04 (2006.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/06 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); G03F 7/70083 (2013.01); G03F 7/70108 (2013.01); G03F 7/70166 (2013.01); G03F 7/702 (2013.01); G03F 7/70233 (2013.01); G03F 7/70358 (2013.01); G03F 7/70891 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227405A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0227405 A2 20020404; WO 0227405 A3 20020718; EP 1320857 A2 20030625; JP 2004510344 A 20040402

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090428

2007-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS SMT AG

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS CARL ZEISS

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR