Global Patent Index - EP 1320863 A1

EP 1320863 A1 2003-06-25 - LAMP BASE COMPRISING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LAMP BASE

Title (en)

LAMP BASE COMPRISING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LAMP BASE

Title (de)

LAMPENSOCKEL MIT EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LAMPENSOCKELS

Title (fr)

CULOT POURVU D'UNE UNITE ELECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1320863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01982133 A

Priority

  • DE 0103678 W
  • DE 10048001 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0227746A1] The invention relates to a lamp base comprising an electronic component with a mounting plate (20) and electronic SMD components (10) fixed thereon. The mounting plate (20) has bent sections (201-205), so that the surface (20a) intended for mounting the electronic components (10) has areas (201a-205a) located on different planes. The mounting plate (20) is preferably curved in a meandering fashion to allow a compact spatial placement of the electronic component (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 5/54; H01J 9/30; H01J 61/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/00 (2006.01); H01J 5/50 (2006.01); H01J 5/54 (2006.01); H01J 9/30 (2006.01); H01J 9/36 (2006.01); H01J 61/56 (2006.01); H05K 1/00 (2006.01); F21Y 101/00 (2016.01); H05K 1/18 (2006.01); H05K 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05K 1/0278 (2013.01); H01J 5/54 (2013.01); H01J 9/30 (2013.01); H01J 61/56 (2013.01); H05K 1/189 (2013.01); H05K 3/202 (2013.01); H05K 2201/0394 (2013.01); H05K 2201/09118 (2013.01); H05K 2201/09736 (2013.01); H05K 2203/302 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0227746A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0227746 A1 20020404; CA 2423466 A1 20030325; EP 1320863 A1 20030625; JP 2004510301 A 20040402; US 2004046507 A1 20040311

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100523

2009-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091111

2009-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUE

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR