Global Patent Index - EP 1320890 A2

EP 1320890 A2 2003-06-25 - RADIATION SOURCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LENS MOULD

Title (en)

RADIATION SOURCE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LENS MOULD

Title (de)

STRAHLUNGSQUELLE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LINSENFORM

Title (fr)

SOURCE DE RAYONNEMENT ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MOULE LENTICULAIRE

Publication

EP 1320890 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01956408 A

Priority

  • DE 0102874 W
  • DE 10038213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0213231A2] The invention relates to a radiation source, which has an assembly of semiconductor chips that are positioned beneath a field of micro-lenses (8) arranged in a hexagonal lattice structure. The radiation source is characterised by a high radiation output and a high radiation density.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 25/075; B29D 11/00; F21V 5/00; G02B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 39/02 (2006.01); B29D 11/00 (2006.01); F21V 5/04 (2006.01); G02B 3/00 (2006.01); H01L 25/075 (2006.01); H01L 33/00 (2006.01); B29L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 3/0031 (2013.01); B29D 11/00278 (2013.01); B29D 11/00365 (2013.01); F21V 5/04 (2013.01); G02B 3/0056 (2013.01); H01L 25/0753 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08); H01L 2224/48091 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48227 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48465 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01019 (2013.01); H01L 2924/12041 (2013.01); H01L 2924/1815 (2013.01); H01L 2924/19041 (2013.01); H01L 2924/19107 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00014
  2. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48227
  3. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48227 + H01L 2924/00
  4. H01L 2224/48465 + H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0213231A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0213231 A2 20020214; WO 0213231 A3 20020620; CN 100517706 C 20090722; CN 101219568 A 20080716; CN 1447983 A 20031008; DE 10038213 A1 20020307; EP 1320890 A2 20030625; JP 2004506321 A 20040226; JP 2007112134 A 20070510; TW 538255 B 20030621; US 2004026706 A1 20040212; US 2007290383 A1 20071220; US 7262437 B2 20070828

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-09 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090730

2009-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090224

2008-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH

2008-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR