Global Patent Index - EP 1320901 A1

EP 1320901 A1 2003-06-25 - IMPROVED BUFFER FOR GROWTH OF GaN ON SAPPHIRE

Title (en)

IMPROVED BUFFER FOR GROWTH OF GaN ON SAPPHIRE

Title (de)

VERBESSERTER PUFFER ZUM WACHSTUM VON GaN AUF SAPHIR

Title (fr)

TAMPON AMELIORE DESTINE A LA CROISSANCE DE GAN SUR SAPHIR

Publication

EP 1320901 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01961721 A

Priority

  • US 0123330 W
  • US 62644200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0209199A1] A GaN based three layer buffer (11) on a sapphire substrate (101) provides a template for growth of a high quality I GaN layer (105) as a substrate for growth of a Nitride based LED.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/20 (2006.01); H01L 33/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/0254 (2013.01); H01L 21/0242 (2013.01); H01L 21/02458 (2013.01); H01L 21/02505 (2013.01); H01L 33/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0209199 A1 20020131; AT 515790 T 20110715; AU 8296601 A 20020205; CA 2412419 A1 20020131; CA 2412419 C 20091006; EP 1320901 A1 20030625; EP 1320901 A4 20060816; EP 1320901 B1 20110706; ES 2367354 T3 20111102; US 2002175337 A1 20021128; US 6495867 B1 20021217; US 6630695 B2 20031007

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110706

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110725

2012-08-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60144918

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110725

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111007

2012-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-02-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111107

2012-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110706

2012-01-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 515790 T

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-11-02 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2367354 T3

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-10-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-08-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60144918

- Effective date: 20110825

2011-08-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2011-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/02 20060101AFI20101202BHEP

2011-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01L 21/20 20060101ALI20101202BHEP

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070508

2006-08-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060719

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUMEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION

2004-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AXT, INC.

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHEN, CHANGHUA

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DONG, JAMES

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIU, HENG

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHENG, XIUPING

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI