Global Patent Index - EP 1320980 A2

EP 1320980 A2 2003-06-25 - MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONY DEVICE WITH FEATURES WHICH CAN BE RELEASED WIRELESSLY BY THE SERVICE PROVIDER

Title (en)

MOBILE RADIOTELEPHONY DEVICE WITH FEATURES WHICH CAN BE RELEASED WIRELESSLY BY THE SERVICE PROVIDER

Title (de)

MOBILFUNKGERÄT MIT DURCH DEN DIENSTLEISTUNGSPROVIDER DRAHTLOS FREISCHALTBAREN MERKMALEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL RADIOTELEPHONIQUE MOBILE AVEC CARACTERISTIQUES POUVANT ETRE DEBLOQUEES SANS FIL PAR LE FOURNISSEUR DE SERVICES

Publication

EP 1320980 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01978138 A

Priority

  • DE 0103521 W
  • DE 10047653 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0228066A2] The invention relates to a mobile radiotelephony device, especially a mobile telephone, comprising an input means (12), a storage means in which features of the mobile telephone (10) that can be requested with the input means (12), such as a fax or modem function, can be implemented and requested with the input means (12), and a transmitting/receiving part. According to the invention, at least some of the implemented features are blocked from access with the input means (12) and can be released with a release code that is supplied by a service provider (16) in the form of a radio signal and that can be received by the transmitting/receiving part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/247; H04M 1/725

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/247 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/72522 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0228066A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0228066 A2 20020404; WO 0228066 A3 20021121; DE 10047653 A1 20020411; EP 1320980 A2 20030625; US 2004038710 A1 20040226

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2010-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.

2009-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PALM, INC.

2009-05-13 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20090803

2007-02-28 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-28 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20070702

2006-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BENQ MOBILE GMBH & CO. OHG

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051010

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR