Global Patent Index - EP 1321007 A1

EP 1321007 A1 2003-06-25 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A CO-EXISTENT COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR GENERATING A CO-EXISTENT COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REALISIERUNG EINER KO-EXISTENZ VON KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE UNE COEXISTENCE DE SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1321007 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00967608 A

Priority

DE 0003354 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0228135A1] The invention relates to a device and method for generating co-existent communication systems, with a commonly used transmission medium (UM), comprising a data communication interface (1), for carrying out a data transmission within a communication system and a priority determining device (3), for determining at least a typical transmission medium usage priority, whereby the data transmission is carried out, depending upon the determined transmission medium usage priority. The co-existence of independent communication systems can be simply regulated by means of the priority assignment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 16/14 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 16/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0228135A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0228135 A1 20020404; CN 100393159 C 20080604; CN 1454437 A 20031105; EP 1321007 A1 20030625; US 7039414 B1 20060502

INPADOC legal status


2012-11-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-08-28 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031105

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI